Pitts v. One Stop Auto Sales
Plaintiff: Naomi N Pitts
Defendant: One Stop Auto Sales
Case Number: 1:2019cv06644
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Initial status hearing held on 12/4/2019. Defendant or counsel not present in Court. Plaintiff's counsel reports on the status of summons and that parties have reached a settlement agreement. Status hearing set for 1/21/2020 at 09:30 AM. The status hearing will be cancelled if a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the hearing. Mailed notice (is, )
November 27, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant One Stop Auto Sales (txl, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Initial status hearing set for 12/4/2019 at 09:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Naomi N Pitts by Daniel Payne Lindsey (Lindsey, Daniel)
October 7, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Liss, Kathryn)
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Naomi N Pitts by Kathryn Marie Liss (Liss, Kathryn)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Naomi N Pitts; jury demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16312746. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Liss, Kathryn)
October 7, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitts v. One Stop Auto Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi N Pitts
Represented By: Daniel Payne Lindsey
Represented By: Kathryn Marie Liss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One Stop Auto Sales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?