WSP USA, Inc. v. Nautilus Insurance Company
Plaintiff: WSP USA, Inc.
Defendant: Nautilus Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv06731
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Contract: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nautilus Insurance Company by Keith M St. Aubin (St. Aubin, Keith)
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Nautilus Insurance Company (Bradford, Mark)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Nautilus Insurance Company by Mark Albert Bradford (Bradford, Mark)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A status hearing is set for 12/19/19 at 9:30 a.m. No later than three business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conferences.' Notices mailed. (psm, )
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by WSP USA, Inc.. Nautilus Insurance Company waiver sent on 10/14/2019, answer due 12/13/2019. (Vanderlaan, Lori)
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff WSP USA, Inc. by Scott Bryan Dolezal (Dolezal, Scott)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff WSP USA, Inc. by Lori Ann Vanderlaan (Vanderlaan, Lori)
October 11, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kl, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by WSP USA, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16328987. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A to C to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit D pages 1 to 60 to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D pages 61 to 110 to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D pages 111 to 154 to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibits E to K to Complaint)(Vanderlaan, Lori)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WSP USA, Inc. v. Nautilus Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nautilus Insurance Company
Represented By: Keith M St. Aubin
Represented By: Mark Albert Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WSP USA, Inc.
Represented By: Lori Ann Vanderlaan
Represented By: Scott Bryan Dolezal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?