Cerda v. Lend Lease (US) Construction, Inc.
Plaintiff: Roberto Cerda
Defendant: Lend Lease (US) Construction, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06900
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 Rule 26(f) Report for Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) , filed by Defendant Lend Lease (US) Construction, Inc.. (Rasp, Kevin)
November 19, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Roberto Cerda by Rodney Craig Bashford (Bashford, Rodney)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lend Lease (US) Construction, Inc. by Andrew J. Holmstrom (Holmstrom, Andrew)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 affirmative defenses ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Lend Lease (US) Construction, Inc.(Rasp, Kevin)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Initial status hearing set for 12/17/19 at 9:30 a.m. Parties shall review and comply with Judge Alonso's Standing Order on The Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project on his website. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
October 18, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rasp, Kevin)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Lend Lease (US) Construction, Inc. by Kevin Christopher Rasp (Rasp, Kevin)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, case number (2019L009724) filed by Lend Lease (US) Construction, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16352662. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service of Process and Complaint)(Rasp, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cerda v. Lend Lease (US) Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lend Lease (US) Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Rasp
Represented By: Andrew J. Holmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Cerda
Represented By: Rodney Craig Bashford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?