Ballard v. Kelly et al
Plaintiff: Mark A. Ballard
Defendant: S. Ward, Will County, Jane Doe, David Adams, John Doe, Dale Santerelli, Michael Kelly, Kevin Meyers, Mary Zaragoza and Stewart Taylor
Case Number: 1:2019cv06958
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Referring Judge: Joan H Lefkow
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Mark A. Ballard for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Exhibits, Envelope not post marked) (nsf, )
November 6, 2019 MAILED Copy of Order dated 11/6/19, and a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis to Plaintiff. (aee, )
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff has submitted a complaint #1 but did not prepay the filing fee or file an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must either: (1) submit a completed application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis that includes the documentation and certified trust account documents described below; or (2) pay the full statutory filing fee of $400. In addition, he must supplement his litigation history disclosures by sending requests for case information to the Clerk of Court for all state and federal courts where he has initiated litigation and filing appropriate disclosures with the information specified by the form complaint, to the best of Plaintiff's ability. If he does not comply with this order in its entirety by December 4, 2019, the Court will summarily dismiss this case. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank application to proceed in forma pauperis, along with a copy of this order. Signed by the Honorable John Z. Lee on 11/6/2019. Mailed notice (aee, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable John Z. Lee for all further proceedings. Case randomly assigned in error. Honorable Joan H. Lefkow no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/23/19. (smm, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (lma, )
October 21, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and no copies by Mark A. Ballard. (Attachments: #1 Envelope postmarked 10/16/2019)(lma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ballard v. Kelly et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Santerelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Zaragoza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A. Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?