Central National Gottesman Inc. v. J.S. Paluch Co. Inc.
Plaintiff: Central National Gottesman Inc. dba Lindenmeyr Munroe and Central National Gottesman Inc.
Defendant: J.S. Paluch Co. Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv06997
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Status hearing set for 1/9/2020 is stricken and reset for 1/10/2020 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defense, and COUNTERCLAIM filed by J.S. Paluch Co. Inc. against Central National Gottesman Inc. . by J.S. Paluch Co. Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Psarras, Diana)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendant's Uncontested Motion for extension of time to answer #8 is granted. Defendant shall answer or otherwise plead by 12/20/2019. The motion presentment date of 12/3/2019 is stricken; parties need not appear. Status hearing set for 12/19/2019 is stricken and reset for 1/9/2020 at 09:00 AM. At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. Mailed notice (ef, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Diana Helene Psarras for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #8 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 12/3/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Psarras, Diana)
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant J.S. Paluch Co. Inc. for extension of time to file answer or other responsive pleading (Uncontested) (Psarras, Diana)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant J.S. Paluch Co. Inc. by Parker Edward Lawton (Lawton, Parker)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant J.S. Paluch Co. Inc. by Diana Helene Psarras (Psarras, Diana)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, )
October 24, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant J.S. Paluch Co. Inc. (rc, )
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Central National Gottesman Inc. dba Lindenmeyr Munroe by Julianne Marie Dailey (Dailey, Julianne)
October 24, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Central National Gottesman Inc. dba Lindenmeyr Munroe by Eric S. Rein (Rein, Eric)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 12/19/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, )
October 23, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Central National Gottesman Inc. dba Lindenmeyr Munroe; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16367894. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rein, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central National Gottesman Inc. v. J.S. Paluch Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central National Gottesman Inc. dba Lindenmeyr Munroe
Represented By: Eric S. Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central National Gottesman Inc.
Represented By: Julianne Marie Dailey
Represented By: Eric S. Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.S. Paluch Co. Inc.
Represented By: Diana Helene Psarras
Represented By: Parker Edward Lawton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?