Life Spine, Inc. v. Aegis Spine, Inc.
Plaintiff: Life Spine, Inc.
Defendant: Aegis Spine, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07092
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 First AMENDED complaint by Life Spine, Inc. against Aegis Spine, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Bunge, Jonathan)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on November 7, 2019, before the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Order Number: 36814. Court Reporter Contact Information: Laura LaCien, 312-408-5032, laura_lacien@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 12/27/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/6/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/5/2020. (Lacien, Laura)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 JOINT CONSENT to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge (bg, )
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AGREED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER Signed by the Honorable John Robert Blakey on 12/4/2019. Mailed notice(gel, )
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Status and motion hearing held on 12/4/2019. Defendant's motion to dismiss #32 is denied without prejudice. Any amended complaint shall be filed on or before 12/13/2019. Plaintiff's motion for protective order #39 is granted. Enter agreed confidentiality order. Based upon the representation of the parties and the execution of the consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge form, this case is transferred to the Magistrate Judge for all purposes. Mailed notice (gel, )
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Christian Bunge for presentment of motion for protective order #39 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 12/10/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Bunge, Jonathan)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION by Plaintiff Life Spine, Inc. for protective order (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Redline of Agreed Confidentiality Order)(Bunge, Jonathan)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's motion to dismiss #32 . Plaintiff is advised to review the Court's standing order on Motions to Dismiss, which is available on the Court's homepage at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. The Court's Order requires Plaintiff to make an election as to whether he/she will amend the complaint or stand on the current complaint and proceed with briefing on the motion to dismiss. Defendant's motion to dismiss #32 is set for 12/4/2019. Plaintiff shall be prepared to make an election regarding Defendant's motion to dismiss at the next hearing. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Alissa B Kelso for presentment of motion to dismiss #32 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 12/4/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Kelso, Alissa)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CERTIFICATE Certificate of Service of defendant responses to plaintiff first set of discovery (Kelso, Alissa)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE of Motion by Alissa B Kelso for presentment of motion to dismiss #32 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 12/4/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Kelso, Alissa)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by Aegis Spine, Inc. (Kelso, Alissa)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM by Aegis Spine, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #32 Counts I, II, V, VI, VII, VIII, IX and X of Plaintiff's Complaint (Kelso, Alissa)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION by Defendant Aegis Spine, Inc. to dismiss Counts I, II, V, VI, VII, VIII, IX and X of Plaintiff's Complaint (Kelso, Alissa)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Ellen Stewart's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #28 is granted. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM by Life Spine, Inc. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Bunge, Jonathan)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 COMPLAINT filed by Life Spine, Inc.; Jury Demand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Bunge, Jonathan)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16434484. (Stewart, Ellen)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Brian R. Markley's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #26 is granted. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for leave to appear pro hac vice by Brian R. Markley for Aegis Spine, Inc. Receipt #4624233066. (las, )
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Motion hearing held on 11/7/2019. Plaintiff's motion to seal document #6 is denied as moot as stated in open court. Plaintiff shall refile documents as stated in open court and may file any exhibits under seal as necessary. Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction #11 is taken under advisement. Plaintiff's motion to seal #15 and Plaintiff's motion to expedite discovery #17 are denied as moot. Status hearing set for 12/4/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Brian Markley's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #21 is granted. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Life Spine, Inc. (Bunge, Jonathan)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Correction regarding MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #21 (las, )
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION by Defendant Aegis Spine, Inc. for leave to appear as Pro Hac Vice (Markley, Brian) Modified on 11/6/2019 (las, ).
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Aegis Spine, Inc. by Alissa B Kelso (Kelso, Alissa)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Christian Bunge for presentment of motion to seal document #6 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 11/7/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Bunge, Jonathan)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Christian Bunge for presentment of motion to expedite #17 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 11/7/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Bunge, Jonathan)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION by Plaintiff Life Spine, Inc. to expedite Discovery (Bunge, Jonathan)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Christian Bunge for presentment of motion to seal #15 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 11/7/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Bunge, Jonathan)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiff Life Spine, Inc. to seal Memorandum of Law and Exhibits in Support of Life Spine Inc.'s Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Bunge, Jonathan)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan Christian Bunge for presentment of motion for preliminary injunction #11 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 11/7/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Bunge, Jonathan)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Life Spine, Inc. Memorandum of Law in Support of Life Spine Inc.'s Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 4 - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 5 - Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 6 - Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 7 - Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 8 - Filed Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 9 - Filed Under Seal, #10 Exhibit 10 - Filed Under Seal, #11 Exhibit 11 - Filed Under Seal, #12 Exhibit 12 - Filed Under Seal)(Bunge, Jonathan)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM by Life Spine, Inc. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #11 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Filed Under Seal, #3 Exhibit 3 - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 4 - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 5 - Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 6 - Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 7 - Filed Under Seal, #8 Exhibit 8 - Filed Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 9 - Filed Under Seal, #10 Exhibit 10 - Filed Under Seal, #11 Exhibit 11 - Filed Under Seal, #12 Exhibit 12 - Filed Under Seal)(Bunge, Jonathan)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION by Plaintiff Life Spine, Inc. for preliminary injunction (Bunge, Jonathan)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP%20Standing%20Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 12/12/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 12/2/2019, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, )
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Aegis Spine, Inc. (acm, )
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, )
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Life Spine, Inc. (Bunge, Jonathan)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Life Spine, Inc. to seal document sealed document #1 Complaint and Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bunge, Jonathan)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Life Spine, Inc. by John Michael Robinson (Robinson, John)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Life Spine, Inc. by Daniel R. Lombard (Lombard, Daniel)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Life Spine, Inc. by Jonathan Christian Bunge (Bunge, Jonathan)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Bunge, Jonathan)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Life Spine, Inc. Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-12)(Bunge, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Life Spine, Inc. v. Aegis Spine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Life Spine, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Christian Bunge
Represented By: Daniel R. Lombard
Represented By: John Michael Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aegis Spine, Inc.
Represented By: Ellen Elizabeth Stewart
Represented By: Brian Richard Markley
Represented By: Alissa B Kelso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?