Quality Food Products, Inc. v. Gentile Bros., Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Quality Food Products, Inc.
Defendant: Thomas E. Gentile and Gentile Bros., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07110
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07:499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Motion to dismiss #4 is granted. Case dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Stipulation #4 . The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, 13 December 2019. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (ewf, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Motion by George V. Kalantzis for presentment of motion to dismiss #4 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 12/13/2019 at 10:30 AM. (Kalantzis, George)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Quality Food Products, Inc. to dismiss by agreement (Kalantzis, George)
October 29, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Quality Food Products, Inc. by George V. Kalantzis (Kalantzis, George)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Kalantzis, George)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Quality Food Products, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16385144.(Kalantzis, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quality Food Products, Inc. v. Gentile Bros., Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quality Food Products, Inc.
Represented By: George V. Kalantzis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. Gentile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gentile Bros., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?