Johnson v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Letitia M Johnson
Defendant: MRLP, Clearvue Capital Corporation, McCalla Rayner Leibert Pierce, Amy Cullen, Shapiro Kreisman, Thomas Belczak, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage N.A. and Amy L. Cullen
Case Number: 1:2019cv07117
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to amend complaint #12 is granted. No appearance on the motion is required. Plaintiff's amended complaint is now due 1/3/20. Defendants' answer is now due 1/24/20. The initial status conference set for 1/7/20 is stricken and re-set for 1/30/20 at 9:00 a.m., and the initial status report is now due 1/23/20.Mailed notice (air, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Motion by Letitia M Johnson for presentment of motion for extension of time to amend #12 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 12/12/2019 at 09:00 AM. (kp, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION by Plaintiff Letitia M Johnson for extension of time to amend complaint. (kp, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:This case is set for an initial status conference on 1/7/20 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status conferences, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==], and to submit the required initial status report no later than 12/31/19. Mailed notice (air, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Letitia M Johnson as to Amy L. Cullen on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019; Wells Fargo Home Mortgage N.A. on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (kp, )
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 11/8/2019: Plaintiff is directed to file, by December 6, 2019, an amended complaint setting forth an adequate basis for this Court to exercise jurisdiction over the claims asserted. Based on the catalog of claims set forth in the amended complaint, there is no apparent basis for this Court to exercise federal question jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1331 and the amended complaint provides no allegations that wouldprovide a basis for a finding of complete diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332. The complaint does not include sufficient information to assess the claims of citizenship of any of the parties. Plaintiff is advised that a national bank is a citizen of the state in which its main office, as set forth in its articles ofassociation, is located. See Wachovia Bank v. Schmidt, 546 U.S. 303, 307 (2006). A corporation is a citizen both of the state in which it is incorporated and the state in which its principal place of business is located. A limited liability company or other unincorporated association is a citizen of every state inwhich its members are citizens. See Fellowes, Inc. v. Changzhou Xinrui Fellowes Office Equip. Co., 759 F.3d 787, 788 (7th Cir. 2014). An individual's citizenship is based on the state in which he is domiciled (which may differ from the state of residence). See generally Heinen v. Northrop GrummanCorp., 671 F.3d 669, 670 (7th Cir. 2012). Plaintiff is also advised that any amended complaint must stand on its own; it cannot incorporate by reference allegations made in prior iterations. Failure to timely file a second amended complaint that adequately invokes federal jurisdiction will result in dismissal of this case. Mailed notice(air, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED complaint by Letitia M Johnson against All Defendants. (kp, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Amy L Cullen. (kp, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Thomas Belczak, Clearvue Capital Corporation, Amy Cullen, Shapiro Kreisman, MRLP, Wells Fargo Home Mortgage N.A. (pk, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Letitia M Johnson (pk, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (pk, )
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Letitia M Johnson. (Exhibit) (pk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearvue Capital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCalla Rayner Leibert Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shapiro Kreisman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Belczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy L. Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Letitia M Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?