Xcellent Masonry Group, Inc. et al v. Pizzella
Plaintiff: Xcellent Masonry Group, Inc. and Pawel Kawula
Defendant: Patrick Pizzella
Case Number: 1:2019cv07129
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial Status hearing set for 1/7/2020 is stricken and reset for 1/10/2020 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Patrick Pizzella (Treacy, Elizabeth)
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendant Patrick Pizzella (Oswald, Craig)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 1/7/2020 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Pawel Kawula, Xcellent Masonry Group, Inc. by Lauren Elizabeth Mcclure (Mcclure, Lauren)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mcclure, Lauren)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Petition for Declaratory Judgment and Other Relief filed by Xcellent Masonry Group, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16388619. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D)(Mcclure, Lauren)
October 30, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Patrick Pizzella, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (acm, )
October 30, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Xcellent Masonry Group, Inc. et al v. Pizzella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Pizzella
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xcellent Masonry Group, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Mcclure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pawel Kawula
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Mcclure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?