Luckett v. City of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: Willie Luckett
Defendant: C. Maloney, Star No. 13032, City of Chicago, E. Avecedo, Star No. 13560, Unknown and Unnamed City of Chicago Police Officers, R. Page, Star No. 11349, J. Cunningham, Star No. 9871, J. Lopez, Star No. 7613, M. Patruno, Star No. 18814, J. Collazo, Star No. 11471 and H. Diaz, Star No. 18700
Case Number: 1:2019cv07132
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Mary M Rowland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion by Maria Elizabeth Magginas for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #13 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 1/7/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Magginas, Maria)
December 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION by Defendants E. Avecedo, Star No. 13560, J. Lopez, Star No. 7613, R. Page, Star No. 11349 for extension of time to file answer (JOINT) UNOPPOSED (Magginas, Maria)
December 26, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants E. Avecedo, Star No. 13560, J. Lopez, Star No. 7613, R. Page, Star No. 11349 by Maria Elizabeth Magginas (Magginas, Maria)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Bret Anthony Kabacinski (Kabacinski, Bret)
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Iris Chavira (Chavira, Iris)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Defendant City of Chicago's motion to extend the time for all named defendants to answer or otherwise plead #7 is granted. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead by 12/30/19. No appearance necessary on 12/4/19. Initial status remains set for 1/15/20. Mailed notice. (dm, )
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Maxwell Evan Lisy for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #7 before Honorable Mary M. Rowland on 12/4/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Lisy, Maxwell)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant City of Chicago for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Lisy, Maxwell)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Maxwell Evan Lisy (Lisy, Maxwell)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Initial status hearing is set for 1/15/20 at 9:30 a.m. No later than five business days before the status hearing, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Initial Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/Judges.aspx by clicking on Judge Rowland's name and then again on the link entitled 'Initial Status Conference.' The litigants are further ordered to review all of Judge Rowland's standing orders and the information available on her webpage. Mailed notice. (dm, )
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, )
October 30, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Willie Luckett by Edward M. Fox (Fox, Edward)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Willie Luckett by Jaclyn Diaz (Diaz, Jaclyn)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Willie Luckett; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16388747. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Diaz, Jaclyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luckett v. City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Maloney, Star No. 13032
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Represented By: Bret Anthony Kabacinski
Represented By: Maxwell Evan Lisy
Represented By: Iris Chavira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Avecedo, Star No. 13560
Represented By: Maria Elizabeth Magginas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown and Unnamed City of Chicago Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Page, Star No. 11349
Represented By: Maria Elizabeth Magginas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Cunningham, Star No. 9871
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lopez, Star No. 7613
Represented By: Maria Elizabeth Magginas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Patruno, Star No. 18814
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Collazo, Star No. 11471
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Diaz, Star No. 18700
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Luckett
Represented By: Edward M. Fox
Represented By: Jaclyn Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?