Craigville Telephone Co. et al v. T-Mobile USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Consolidated Telephone Company and Craigville Telephone Co.
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc., Inteliquent, Inc. and Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2019cv07190
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Motion by David Thomas Beech Audley for presentment of motion for disclosure,, motion for discovery, #31 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 1/7/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Audley, David)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM by Consolidated Telephone Company, Craigville Telephone Co. in support of motion for disclosure,, motion for discovery, #31 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Audley, David)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION by Plaintiffs Consolidated Telephone Company, Craigville Telephone Co. for disclosure (to Establish Date for Initial Disclosures), MOTION by Plaintiffs Consolidated Telephone Company, Craigville Telephone Co. for discovery (Audley, David)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion for leave to file excess pages #28 is granted. T-Mobile may file a memorandum of law in support of its motion to dismiss of up to 30 pages. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Motion by Nigel F. Telman for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages #28 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/19/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Telman, Nigel)
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION by Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc. for leave to file excess pages Unopposed (Telman, Nigel)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: The initial status hearing set for 1/17/20 is reset to 1/22/20 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion for extension of time until January 15, 2020 to answer #21 is granted. No appearance is required on the motion.Mailed notice (ca, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Inteliquent, Inc. by Devin James Carpenter (Carpenter, Devin)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Inteliquent, Inc. by Michael S. Pullos (Pullos, Michael)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Inteliquent, Inc. by John J. Hamill, Jr (Hamill, John)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Motion by Nigel F. Telman for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #21 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 12/12/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Telman, Nigel)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION by Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc. for extension of time to file answer (UNOPPOSED) (Telman, Nigel)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant T-Mobile USA, Inc. by Nigel F. Telman (Telman, Nigel)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AMENDED complaint by Craigville Telephone Co., Consolidated Telephone Company against Inteliquent, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Audley, David)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CERTIFICATE Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project for David T.B. Audley (Audley, David)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project for Mia D. D'Andrea (D'andrea, Mia)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CERTIFICATE Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project for Cathy A. Hinger (D'andrea, Mia)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project for Kurt D. Weaver (D'andrea, Mia)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CERTIFICATE Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project for G. David Carter, Jr. (D'andrea, Mia)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craigville Telephone Co., Consolidated Telephone Company as to Inteliquent, Inc. on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (D'andrea, Mia)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craigville Telephone Co., Consolidated Telephone Company as to T-Mobile USA, Inc. on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (D'andrea, Mia)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Local Rule 3.2 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure STATEMENT by Consolidated Telephone Company, Craigville Telephone Co. (D'andrea, Mia)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Initial status hearing set for 1/17/20 at 2:00 p.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motions to appear pro hac vice by Kurt Weaver #5 , Cathy Hinger #7 and G. David Carter, Jr. #8 are granted.Mailed notice (ca, )
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16411106. (G. David Carter, Jr.) (D'andrea, Mia)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16408867. (Cathy A. Hinger) (D'andrea, Mia)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, )
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Inteliquent, Inc., and T-Mobile USA, Inc. (acm, )
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16400125. for Kurt D. Weaver (D'andrea, Mia)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Consolidated Telephone Company, Craigville Telephone Co. by David Thomas Beech Audley (Audley, David)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Consolidated Telephone Company, Craigville Telephone Co. by Mia D. D'andrea (D'andrea, Mia)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (D'andrea, Mia)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Craigville Telephone Co., Consolidated Telephone Company; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16397917. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(D'andrea, Mia)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Craigville Telephone Co. et al v. T-Mobile USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Represented By: Nigel F. Telman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inteliquent, Inc.
Represented By: Devin James Carpenter
Represented By: John J. Hamill, Jr.
Represented By: Michael S. Pullos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consolidated Telephone Company
Represented By: David Thomas Beech Audley
Represented By: Mia D. D'andrea
Represented By: G. David Carter
Represented By: Cathy Hinger
Represented By: Kurt Douglas Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craigville Telephone Co.
Represented By: David Thomas Beech Audley
Represented By: Mia D. D'andrea
Represented By: G David Carter, Jr.
Represented By: Cathy Hinger
Represented By: Kurt Douglas Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?