Leonard et al v. Claimassist, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dominic Hernandez and Kristine Leonard
Defendant: Credit Control Services, Inc., Edward-Elmhurst Healthcare and Claimassist, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv07231
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Robert Blakey
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2019 Filing 19 Notice of Settlement by Dominic Hernandez, Kristine Leonard as to all Defendants (McGarry, Daniel)
December 20, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: On the Court's own motion, status hearing set for 1/15/2020 is reset for 2/5/2020 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. Mailed notice (gel, )
December 6, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendants ClaimAssist and Credit Control's unopposed motion for extension #15 is granted, and those Defendants' answers or other responsive pleadings shall be filed on or before 12/26/19. In addition, Defendant Edward-Elmhurst Healthcare's agreed motion for extension #11 is granted, and its answer or other responsive pleading shall be filed on or before 12/27/19. The 12/12/19 notices of motion date is stricken, and the parties need not appear. In addition, the initial status conference previously scheduled for 12/19/19 is hereby stricken and reset for 1/15/20 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. The parties' joint status report shall be filed on or before 1/8/20. Mailed notice (cn).
December 5, 2019 Filing 16 Defendants ClaimAssist, LLC and Credit Control Services, Inc.'s NOTICE of Motion by Avanti Bakane for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #15 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 12/12/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Bakane, Avanti)
December 5, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION by Defendants Claimassist, LLC, Credit Control Services, Inc. for extension of time to file answer Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Bakane, Avanti)
December 5, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Claimassist, LLC, Credit Control Services, Inc. by Christina Maria Flores (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Flores, Christina)
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Claimassist, LLC, Credit Control Services, Inc. by Avanti Bakane (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bakane, Avanti)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed NOTICE of Motion by Ronald J. Hennings for presentment of before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 12/12/2019 at 09:45 AM. (Hennings, Ronald)
December 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Edward-Elmhurst Healthcare for extension of time to file answer (Hennings, Ronald)
December 5, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Edward-Elmhurst Healthcare by Ronald J. Hennings (Hennings, Ronald)
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Claimassist, LLC, Credit Control Services, Inc. by Andrew Michael Schwartz (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schwartz, Andrew)
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristine Leonard, Dominic Hernandez as to Edward-Elmhurst Healthcare on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (McGarry, Daniel)
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristine Leonard, Dominic Hernandez as to Credit Control Services, Inc. on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (McGarry, Daniel)
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristine Leonard, Dominic Hernandez as to Claimassist, LLC on 11/15/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (McGarry, Daniel)
November 12, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Claimassist, LLC, Credit Control Services, Inc., Edward-Elmhurst Healthcare (Lam, Tina)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP%20Standing%20Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Courts own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 12/19/2019 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 12/9/2019, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
November 4, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (yt)
November 3, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Dominic Hernandez, Kristine Leonard by Daniel John McGarry (McGarry, Daniel)
November 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (McGarry, Daniel)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kristine Leonard, Dominic Hernandez; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16401407. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - debt itemization, #2 Exhibit B - call log, #3 Exhibit C - lien notice)(McGarry, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonard et al v. Claimassist, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Control Services, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Michael Schwartz
Represented By: Christina Maria Flores
Represented By: Avanti Bakane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward-Elmhurst Healthcare
Represented By: Ronald J. Hennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Claimassist, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Michael Schwartz
Represented By: Christina Maria Flores
Represented By: Avanti Bakane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominic Hernandez
Represented By: Daniel John McGarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine Leonard
Represented By: Daniel John McGarry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?