Day v. Boudreau et al
Plaintiff: Arnold Day
Defendant: James Brennan, Dan McWeeny, William Foley, Michael Kill, City of Chicago, Unidentified Employees of the City of Chicago, Anthony Watson, Kenneth Boudreau, Jude Evans and Marty Radtke
Case Number: 1:2019cv07286
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Referring Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Filing 25 STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Arnold Day (Spence, Renee)
December 20, 2019 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Arnold Day. Marty Radtke waiver sent on 12/17/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (Spence, Renee)
December 20, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Arnold Day. Kenneth Boudreau waiver sent on 12/17/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (Spence, Renee)
December 20, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Arnold Day. Jude Evans waiver sent on 12/17/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (Spence, Renee)
December 20, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Arnold Day. Dan McWeeny waiver sent on 12/17/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (Spence, Renee)
December 20, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Arnold Day. Anthony Watson waiver sent on 12/17/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (Spence, Renee)
December 20, 2019 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kenneth Boudreau, Jude Evans, Dan McWeeny, Marty Radtke, Anthony Watson by Brittany Danielle Johnson (Johnson, Brittany)
December 20, 2019 Filing 18 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kenneth Boudreau, Jude Evans, Dan McWeeny, Marty Radtke, Anthony Watson by Andrew Joseph Grill (Grill, Andrew)
December 20, 2019 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kenneth Boudreau, Jude Evans, Dan McWeeny, Marty Radtke, Anthony Watson by Patrick R Moran (Moran, Patrick)
December 20, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Kenneth Boudreau, Jude Evans, Dan McWeeny, Marty Radtke, Anthony Watson by Eileen Ellen Rosen (Rosen, Eileen)
December 12, 2019 Filing 15 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by James Gus Sotos (Sotos, James)
December 12, 2019 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Joseph M. Polick (Polick, Joseph)
December 11, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Sara J Schroeder (Schroeder, Sara)
December 11, 2019 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by George John Yamin, Jr (Yamin, George)
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Jeffrey Neil Given (Given, Jeffrey)
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 1/8/2020 at 9:30AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 12/30/2019. Mailed notice (rj, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis for all further proceedings. Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/14/19. (kp, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Arnold Day by Steven Allen Greenberg (Greenberg, Steven)
November 6, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Kenneth Boudreau, James Brennan, City of Chicago, Jude Evans, Dan McWeeny, Marty Radtke, and Anthony Watson. (acm, )
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Arnold Day by D. Samuel Heppell (Heppell, D.)
November 5, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Arnold Day by Gayle M. Horn (Horn, Gayle)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Arnold Day by Jonathan I. Loevy (Loevy, Jonathan)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Arnold Day by Arthur R. Loevy (Loevy, Arthur)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Arnold Day by Renee Spence (Spence, Renee)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Arnold Day; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16407270. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spence, Renee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Day v. Boudreau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan McWeeny
Represented By: Patrick R Moran
Represented By: Brittany Danielle Johnson
Represented By: Eileen Ellen Rosen
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Represented By: Sara J Schroeder
Represented By: George John Yamin, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey Neil Given
Represented By: Joseph M. Polick
Represented By: James Gus Sotos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Employees of the City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Watson
Represented By: Patrick R Moran
Represented By: Brittany Danielle Johnson
Represented By: Eileen Ellen Rosen
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Boudreau
Represented By: Patrick R Moran
Represented By: Brittany Danielle Johnson
Represented By: Eileen Ellen Rosen
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jude Evans
Represented By: Patrick R Moran
Represented By: Brittany Danielle Johnson
Represented By: Eileen Ellen Rosen
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Radtke
Represented By: Patrick R Moran
Represented By: Brittany Danielle Johnson
Represented By: Eileen Ellen Rosen
Represented By: Andrew Joseph Grill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Day
Represented By: Arthur R. Loevy
Represented By: Renee Spence
Represented By: Jonathan I. Loevy
Represented By: Gayle M. Horn
Represented By: D. Samuel Heppell
Represented By: Steven Allen Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?