Gaddis v. National Collegiate Athletic Association et al
Plaintiff: Versie Gaddis
Defendant: Big Ten Conference, Inc. and National Collegiate Athletic Association
Case Number: 1:2019cv07334
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 13 MAILED MDL Transfer In Letter to all counsel of record. (las, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 12 RECEIVED from Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-02792 (ls)
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Illinois. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Illinois, IN RE: MDL 2492 on November 6, 2019. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 CLOSED TRANSFER to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Illinois IN RE: MDL 2492 IN RE: National Collegiate Athletic Association Student-Athlete Concussion Injury Litigation Certified Transfer Order # 23. (MAC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. (Mester, Mark) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. (Mester, Mark) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark S. Mester on behalf of Defendant NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. (Mester, Mark) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed, filed by VERSIE GADDIS. NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION waiver sent on 8/26/2019. (Circelli, Vincent) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.]
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Vincent P. Circelli's #4 Motion to Appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff VERSIE GADDIS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 7/23/2019. (SWM) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Attorney(s) Vincent P. Circelli to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5536668), filed by Plaintiff VERSIE GADDIS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Circelli, Vincent) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.]
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge James R. Sweeney II. (JDC) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.]
July 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against THE BIG TEN CONFERENCE, INC., THE NATIONAL COLLEGIATE ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION, filed by VERSIE GADDIS. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5517220) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Circelli, Vincent) Modified on 7/9/2019 (double docket text) (DJH). [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 11/8/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaddis v. National Collegiate Athletic Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Ten Conference, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Collegiate Athletic Association
Represented By: Mark Steven Mester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Versie Gaddis
Represented By: Vincent P. Circelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?