Page v. Toledo et al
Plaintiff: Dion Page
Defendant: Peter Toledo, CITY OF CHICAGO CITY OF CHICAGO and City of Chicago
Case Number: 1:2019cv07420
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Filing 17 STATUS Report Rule 26(f) by Dion Page (Marsh, Jordan)
December 30, 2019 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Peter Toledo by Allison Lynn Romelfanger (Romelfanger, Allison)
December 26, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand and affirmative defenses by Peter Toledo(Dory, Emily)
December 26, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by City of Chicago(Berrington, Marques)
December 23, 2019 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Peter Toledo by Jessica D Ziswa (Ziswa, Jessica)
December 19, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial Status hearing set for 1/9/2020 is stricken and reset for 1/10/2020 at 09:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Raoul Vertick Mowatt (Mowatt, Raoul)
December 13, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Peter Toledo by Emily Elizabeth Dory (Dory, Emily)
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendant City of Chicago's unopposed motion for an extension of time to answer or otherwise plead #7 is granted. Defendants City of Chicago and Peter Toledo shall have until 12/26/2019 to answer or otherwise plead. Motion hearing set for 12/10/2019 is stricken; parties need not appear. Initial status hearing set for 1/9/2020 #5 remains firm. Mailed notice. (dal, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED NOTICE of Motion by Marques Alan Berrington for presentment of extension of time #7 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 12/10/2019 at 09:00 AM. (Berrington, Marques)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Defendant City of Chicago for extension of time for all defendants to answer or otherwise plead (unopposed) (Berrington, Marques)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Marques Alan Berrington (Berrington, Marques)
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 1/9/2020 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, )
November 8, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants CITY OF CHICAGO CITY OF CHICAGO, Peter Toledo (jn, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marsh, Jordan)
November 8, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, )
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marsh, Jordan)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Dion Page; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16424586.(Marsh, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Page v. Toledo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Toledo
Represented By: Emily Elizabeth Dory
Represented By: Allison Lynn Romelfanger
Represented By: Jessica D Ziswa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF CHICAGO CITY OF CHICAGO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Represented By: Raoul Vertick Mowatt
Represented By: Marques Alan Berrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dion Page
Represented By: Jordan Marsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?