Page v. City of Chicago et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Page
Defendant: City of Chicago and Unknown Chicago Police Officers
Case Number: 1:2019cv07431
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: An audit was performed on cases filed that allege violation of civil rights by a prisoner or former prisoner. Based on this review, this matter is more properly designated as a Nature of Suit 550 (Prison Civil Rights). Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to change the Nature of Suit to 550. No further action is needed by the parties. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant City of Chicago by Bret Anthony Kabacinski (Kabacinski, Bret)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman and is set for a status hearing on 1/13/2020 at 9:00 AM. The parties are reminded to review the timelines set out in this Court's Standing Order Regarding the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. If both parties have appearances on file, the parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. Otherwise, the parties are to file a joint status report 3 business days, or as soon possible, prior to the parties' first appearance before the Court. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The Court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joshua Page by Edward M. Fox (Fox, Edward)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
November 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Lam, Tina)
November 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joshua Page by Garrett W. Browne (Browne, Garrett)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Joshua Page by Edward M. Fox (Fox, Edward)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Joshua Page; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16426230. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Browne, Garrett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Page v. City of Chicago et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Represented By: Bret Anthony Kabacinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Chicago Police Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Page
Represented By: Edward M. Fox
Represented By: Garrett W. Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?