Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Welfare Fund et al v. Aztec Cement Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Welfare Fund, Lake County, Illinois, Plasterers & Cement Masons Retirement Savings Fund and Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Pension Fund
Defendant: Jorge Torrez and Aztec Cement Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07433
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Elaine E Bucklo
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Welfare Fund, Lake County, Illinois, Plasterers & Cement Masons Retirement Savings Fund, Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Pension Fund as to Jorge Torrez on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Chapman, Catherine)
November 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Welfare Fund, Lake County, Illinois, Plasterers & Cement Masons Retirement Savings Fund, Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Pension Fund as to Aztec Cement Company, Inc. on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Chapman, Catherine)
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling conference set for 2/28/2020 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) report re MIDP due 2/25/2020. The report must comply with the requirements of the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg)
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, )
November 12, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Aztec Cement Company, Inc., Jorge Torrez (rc, )
November 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Lam, Tina)
November 11, 2019 Filing 4 Memorandum of Agreement (exhibit to Complaint [Dkt. 1]) by Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Pension Fund, Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Welfare Fund, Lake County, Illinois, Plasterers & Cement Masons Retirement Savings Fund (Chapman, Catherine)
November 11, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Pension Fund, Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Welfare Fund, Lake County, Illinois, Plasterers & Cement Masons Retirement Savings Fund by Cecilia M. Scanlon (Scanlon, Cecilia)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Pension Fund, Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Welfare Fund, Lake County, Illinois, Plasterers & Cement Masons Retirement Savings Fund by Catherine Marie Chapman (Chapman, Catherine)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Welfare Fund, Lake County, Illinois, Plasterers & Cement Masons Retirement Savings Fund, Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Pension Fund; n. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16426379. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chapman, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Welfare Fund et al v. Aztec Cement Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Welfare Fund
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Catherine Marie Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lake County, Illinois, Plasterers & Cement Masons Retirement Savings Fund
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Catherine Marie Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fox Valley & Vicinity Construction Workers Pension Fund
Represented By: Cecilia M. Scanlon
Represented By: Catherine Marie Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Torrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aztec Cement Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?