UNITE HERE Health et al v. Chestnut Street Hotel Management, LLC
Plaintiff: UNITE HERE Health and Matthew Walker
Defendant: Chestnut Street Hotel Management, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv07453
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles P Kocoras
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 12 JUDGMENT ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 1/7/2020. Mailed notice(vcf, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Motion hearing held. Motion for entry of default and judgment #7 is entered. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (vcf, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Deborah Sippos regarding motion for entry of default, motion for judgment #7 (Finnegan, Laura)
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Laura M. Finnegan regarding motion for entry of default, motion for judgment #7 (Finnegan, Laura)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Laura M. Finnegan for presentment of motion for entry of default, motion for judgment #7 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 1/7/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Finnegan, Laura)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION by Plaintiffs UNITE HERE Health, Matthew Walker for entry of default , MOTION by Plaintiffs UNITE HERE Health, Matthew Walker for judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service)(Finnegan, Laura)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 1/7/2020 at 9:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report on the following: 1. Possibility of settlement. 2. If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to prepare the case for resolution. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by UNITE HERE Health, Matthew Walker as to Chestnut Street Hotel Management, LLC on 11/18/2019, answer due 12/9/2019. (Finnegan, Laura)
November 12, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Chestnut Street Hotel Management, LLC (Lam, Tina)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 Notice to Secretary of Treasury of Complaint for Collection of Delinquent Contributions by UNITE HERE Health, Matthew Walker (Finnegan, Laura)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Notice to Secretary of Labor of Complaint for Collection of Delinquent Contributions by UNITE HERE Health, Matthew Walker (Finnegan, Laura)
November 12, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Lam, Tina)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs UNITE HERE Health, Matthew Walker by Laura M. Finnegan (Finnegan, Laura)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by UNITE HERE Health, Matthew Walker; n. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16427007. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Finnegan, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITE HERE Health et al v. Chestnut Street Hotel Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITE HERE Health
Represented By: Laura M. Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Walker
Represented By: Laura M. Finnegan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chestnut Street Hotel Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?