Travelers Home & Marine Insurance Company a/s/o Rose Corcoran v. Gree USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Travelers Home & Marine Insurance Company a/s/o Rose Corcoran and Travelers Home & Marine Ins. Co.
Defendant: Gree USA, Inc., MJC America Holdings Co., Inc., MJC America LTD d/b/a Soleus International, Inc. and MJC America LTD
Case Number: 1:2019cv07558
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of Service Defendants' MIDPP Responses by Matthew P Dixon on behalf of Gree USA, Inc., MJC America Holdings Co., Inc., MJC America LTD (Dixon, Matthew)
January 9, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Travelers Home & Marine Ins. Co.. (Schuster, Richard)
December 20, 2019 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:The status hearing set for 1/31/20 is reset to 2/4/20 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice (ca, )
December 12, 2019 Filing 11 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Gree USA, Inc., MJC America Holdings Co., Inc., MJC America LTD(Dixon, Matthew)
December 12, 2019 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Gree USA, Inc., MJC America Holdings Co., Inc., MJC America LTD by Matthew P Dixon (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dixon, Matthew)
December 10, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Gree USA, Inc., MJC America Holdings Co., Inc., and MJC America LTD. (acm, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Feiereisel, Gary)
November 21, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project - CERTIFICATION (Schuster, Richard)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Initial status hearing set for 1/31/20 at 2:00 p.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee:Motion to appear pro hac vice by Richard A. Schuster #4 is granted.Mailed notice (ca, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (smm, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16450719. (Schuster, Richard)
November 15, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Lam, Tina)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Travelers Home & Marine Insurance Company a/s/o Rose Corcoran by Gary Feiereisel (Feiereisel, Gary)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Feiereisel, Gary)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Travelers Home & Marine Insurance Company a/s/o Rose Corcoran; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16444534.(Feiereisel, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Home & Marine Insurance Company a/s/o Rose Corcoran v. Gree USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gree USA, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew P Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC America Holdings Co., Inc.
Represented By: Matthew P Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC America LTD d/b/a Soleus International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJC America LTD
Represented By: Matthew P Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Home & Marine Insurance Company a/s/o Rose Corcoran
Represented By: Gary Feiereisel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Home & Marine Ins. Co.
Represented By: Gary Feiereisel
Represented By: Richard A Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?