Hryniewicki v. Amazon Web Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Asia Hryniewicki
Defendant: Amazon Web Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07569
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth Brooke Herrington for presentment of motion to dismiss #18 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 1/22/2020 at 09:15 AM. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
January 13, 2020 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM by Amazon Web Services, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss #18 Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Using AWS, #2 Exhibit B - Namuwonge Opinion, #3 Exhibit C - Cameron Transcript, #4 Exhibit D - Bernal Opinion, #5 Exhibit E - AWS Customer Agreement, #6 Exhibit F - Data Privacy FAQ)(Herrington, Elizabeth)
January 13, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION by Defendant Amazon Web Services, Inc. to dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) (Herrington, Elizabeth)
December 18, 2019 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status report is now due by 1/14/2020. Mailed notice (cdh, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Motion for extension of time #14 is granted. Initial status hearing set for 1/8/2020 is reset to 1/16/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Notice of motion date of 12/19/2019 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth Brooke Herrington for presentment of extension of time #14 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 12/19/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
December 17, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant Amazon Web Services, Inc. for extension of time (JOINT) (Herrington, Elizabeth)
November 20, 2019 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to complaint #11 is granted to and including 12/23/2019. In view of this extension, the initial status hearing is reset from 12/18/2019 to 1/8/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Joint status report is due by 1/6/2020. Notice of motion date of 11/21/2019 is stricken and no appearances are necessary on that date. Mailed notice (cdh, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth Brooke Herrington for presentment of extension of time #11 before Honorable Robert M. Dow Jr. on 11/21/2019 at 09:15 AM. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
November 18, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION by Defendant Amazon Web Services, Inc. for extension of time to Respond to Complaint (Unopposed) (Herrington, Elizabeth)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Amazon Web Services, Inc. (Herrington, Elizabeth)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 12/18/2020 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (mc, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (mc, )
November 18, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amazon Web Services, Inc. by Alborz Hassani (Hassani, Alborz)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amazon Web Services, Inc. by Tyler Zachary Zmick (Zmick, Tyler)
November 15, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amazon Web Services, Inc. by Alex David Berger (Berger, Alex)
November 15, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Amazon Web Services, Inc. by Elizabeth Brooke Herrington (Herrington, Elizabeth)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Herrington, Elizabeth)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of the 19th Judicial Circuit Lake County, case number (2019-CH-00001155) filed by Amazon Web Services, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16446281. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Herrington, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hryniewicki v. Amazon Web Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Web Services, Inc.
Represented By: Alex David Berger
Represented By: Alborz Hassani
Represented By: Tyler Zachary Zmick
Represented By: Elizabeth Brooke Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asia Hryniewicki
Represented By: Jad Sheikali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?