Bromfield v. Hertz Corporation Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan et al
Plaintiff: Sean Bromfield
Defendant: Hertz Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan, Hertz Corporation, The Hertz Corporation and Hertz Corporation Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan
Case Number: 1:2019cv07664
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:The defendants' agreed motion for extension of time to respond to the amended complaint #14 is granted. The defendants' responsive pleadings are now due on 2/14/20. No appearance on the motion is required. The initial status conference is reset for 2/27/20 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status conferences, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==], and to submit the required initial status report no later than 2/20/20. Mailed notice (air, )
January 14, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Hertz Corporation Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan, The Hertz Corporation by Rebecca Kay Bryant (Bryant, Rebecca)
January 14, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Ian H. Morrison for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #14 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 1/21/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Morrison, Ian)
January 14, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendants Hertz Corporation Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan, The Hertz Corporation for extension of time to file answer and to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Agreed) (Morrison, Ian)
January 14, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Hertz Corporation Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan, The Hertz Corporation by Ian H. Morrison (Morrison, Ian)
January 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE by Sean Bromfield re amended complaint #11 (Case, Kristin)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED complaint by Sean Bromfield against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Case, Kristin)
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:This case is set for an initial status conference on 2/5/20 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures for initial status conferences, located at [https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judge-info.aspx?79eF+7uiX7ewBj/ITKrjoA==], and to submit the required initial status report no later than 1/29/20. Mailed notice (air, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Sean Bromfield re waiver of service executed #7 , waiver of service executed #8 (Case, Kristin)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Sean Bromfield. Hertz Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan waiver sent on 11/21/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Case, Kristin)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Sean Bromfield. Hertz Corporation waiver sent on 11/21/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Case, Kristin)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sean Bromfield by Kathleen O. Sedey (Sedey, Kathleen)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Sean Bromfield by Kristin Meridith Case (Case, Kristin)
November 20, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Case, Kristin)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Case, Kristin)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Sean Bromfield; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16459498. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Case, Kristin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bromfield v. Hertz Corporation Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Bromfield
Represented By: Kristin Meridith Case
Represented By: Kathleen O. Sedey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hertz Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hertz Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hertz Corporation
Represented By: Ian H. Morrison
Represented By: Rebecca Kay Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hertz Corporation Supplemental Executive Retirement Plan
Represented By: Ian H. Morrison
Represented By: Rebecca Kay Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?