Glass v. Board of Trustees of Governors State University
Plaintiff: Levi Glass, Jr and Levi Glass
Defendant: Board of Trustees Governors State, Governors State University and Board of Trustees of Governors State University
Case Number: 1:2019cv07775
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Levi Glass. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Summons)(Wilkins-Brown, Sabrina)
November 27, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Levi Glass, Jr by Sabrina R Wilkins-Brown (Attachments: #1 Attorney Appearance)(Wilkins-Brown, Sabrina)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Waiver of Service sent to Governors State on Dec. 2, 2019 by Plaintiff Levi Glass, Jr. Waiver of service due by 1/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Summons)(Wilkins-Brown, Sabrina)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Levi Glass. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16475162. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilkins-Brown, Sabrina) (Docket Text modified by Clerk's Office on 11/27/2019) (lma, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glass v. Board of Trustees of Governors State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees Governors State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governors State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of Governors State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Glass, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Glass
Represented By: Sabrina R Wilkins-Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?