Warren v. U.S. Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Gerald R Warren
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv07793
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: Pursuant to plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal #8 , this case is dismissed without prejudice. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (is, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Gerald R Warren for presentment of motion to dismiss the case #8 before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 12/26/2019 at 09:30 AM. (pk, )
December 20, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Gerald R Warren to dismiss the case. (pk, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 is denied without prejudice. Plaintiff is given 21 days from the date of entry of this order to either pay the filing fee or file a revised application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, which fully and accurately responds to each question on the application. In the event Plaintiff does not pay the filing fee or file a revised application to proceed in forma pauperis within the deadline provided, the case will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman on 12/9/2019. Mailed notice. (sxb, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Gerald R Warren for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (bg, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Gerald R Warren (bg, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (bg, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 2 copies by Gerald R Warren (bg, ) Modified on 12/2/2019 (bg, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren v. U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald R Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?