Freeland v. Lorenzini & Associates, Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Eric A Freeland
Defendant: Lorenzini & Associates, Ltd. and Ronald N Lorenzini Jr
Case Number: 1:2019cv07888
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sara L Ellis
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 42 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court strikes the status hearing set for 9/22/2020 and resets it to 3/9/2021 at 9:30 a.m. The Court sets the following discovery schedule: MIDP is due by 10/19/2020; written discovery to issue by 11/2/2020; final supplementation of MIDP is due by 3/5/2021; fact discovery closes on 4/2/2021. The parties should file a status report on 3/1/2021 indicating the status of fact discovery, whether the parties require expert discovery and whether they require it prior to any dispositive motions, a proposed summary judgment briefing schedule, and the status of any settlement discussions. Mailed notice (rj, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 41 DEFENDANTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND ANSWER to Complaint by Lorenzini & Associates, Ltd., Ronald N Lorenzini Jr (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Morrissey, Mary)
September 15, 2020 Filing 40 STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Eric A Freeland (Gorman, Patrick)
August 28, 2020 Filing 39 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Motion hearing via telephone held on 8/28/2020. Motion for default judgment #18 is denied without prejudice. Petition for attorneys' fees and costs for Favaro & Gorman, Ltd. #32 is denied. Defendants are granted leave to answer or otherwise plead by 9/18/2020. The Court's order #29 awarding costs and fees in the amount of $500 to stand. Telephone Conference set for 9/22/2020 at 9:30 AM with joint status report by 9/15/2020. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 38 RESPONSE by Lorenzini & Associates, Ltd., Ronald N Lorenzini Jrin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Eric A Freeland for default judgment as to defendants Lorenzini & Associates, Ltd. and Ronald N. Lorenzini, Jr. #18 (Dalton, John)
August 27, 2020 Filing 37 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Lorenzini & Associates, Ltd., Ronald N Lorenzini Jr by Mary Kay Morrissey (Morrissey, Mary)
August 27, 2020 Filing 36 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Lorenzini & Associates, Ltd., Ronald N Lorenzini Jr by John D. Dalton (Dalton, John)
July 29, 2020 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Telephone conference held on 7/29/2020. The Court grants Defendant's oral motion for an extension of time to retain counsel. Plaintiff's motion for default #18 is entered and continued to 8/28/2020 at 9:45 AM via telephone. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 34 Re-Notice of Motion NOTICE of Motion by Patrick John Gorman for presentment of motion for default judgment #18 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 7/29/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Gorman, Patrick)
July 22, 2020 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Declaration of Eric A. Freeland in Support of Motion for Default (Gorman, Patrick)
July 22, 2020 Filing 32 PETITION Petition for Attorneys' Fees and Costs For Favaro & Gorman, Ltd. (Gorman, Patrick)
July 15, 2020 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court extends the time for Plaintiff to file any affidavits supporting a default judgment amount to be filed by 7/22/2020. Mailed notice (rj, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk7, Docket)
July 6, 2020 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The Court strikes the status date set for 7/7/2020 and resets it to 7/29/2020 where Plaintiff should notice his motion for default judgment for 9:45 a.m. The Court grants Plaintiff's motion for costs and fees pursuant to F.R.C.P. 4(d)(2) and imposes costs and fees in the amount of $500 #15 . The Court reduces the amount requested by Plaintiff by $125 in process server costs because the process server served both defendants on 1/18/2020 and had no need to attempt service on a subsequent date and $125 in fees because the Court granted this motion without appearance in court. The Court directs Plaintiff to file any affidavits supporting a default judgment amount by 7/15/2020. The parties will appear via teleconference. Throughout the telephonic hearing, each speaker will be expected to identify themselves for the record before speaking. Please note that the conference call-in will be used by all cases that are on the court's calendar for the said date, therefore counsel must be in a quiet area while on the line and must have the telephone muted until your case is called. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing. The call-in number is (866) 434-5269 and the access code is 8087837. Counsel of record will receive an email the morning of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (rj, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket8, )
May 18, 2020 Filing 27 STATUS Report COVID-19 Status Report by Eric A Freeland (Gorman, Patrick)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket7, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER CORRECTED ENTRY: ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice...Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020:Mailed notice(docket7, )
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/23/2020: Mailed notice. (docket7, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Motion hearing as to motion for default judgment #18 set for 3/17/2020 is stricken and reset to 3/26/2020 at 1:45 PM. Mailed notice (rj, )
March 10, 2020 Filing 21 Re-Notice of Motion for Motion for Default NOTICE of Motion by Patrick John Gorman for presentment of motion for default judgment #18 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 3/17/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Gorman, Patrick)
March 2, 2020 Filing 20 Amended Notice of Motion for Motion for Default NOTICE of Motion by Patrick John Gorman for presentment of motion for default judgment #18 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 3/11/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Gorman, Patrick)
March 2, 2020 Filing 19 Notice of Motion for Motion for Default NOTICE of Motion by Patrick John Gorman for presentment of motion for default judgment #18 before Honorable Sara L. Ellis on 3/11/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Gorman, Patrick)
February 21, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION by Plaintiff Eric A Freeland for default judgment as to defendants Lorenzini & Associates, Ltd. and Ronald N. Lorenzini, Jr. (Gorman, Patrick)
February 4, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: Status hearing held on 2/4/2020. Plaintiff appears for status and motion for costs and Defendant fails to appear. Briefing schedule on motion for costs #15 : Defendants' response is due by 3/5/2020. Discovery schedule: MIDP is due by 3/12/2020; written discovery to issue by 3/26/2020; final supplementation of MIDP is due by 7/31/2020; fact discovery closes on 8/28/2020. Next status date set for 7/7/2020 at 9:30 AM to report on discovery and settlement. Mailed notice (rj, )
January 28, 2020 Filing 16 STATUS Report by Eric A Freeland (Gorman, Patrick)
January 28, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION by Plaintiff Eric A FreelandCosts and Fees Under Rule 4(d)(2) (Gorman, Patrick)
January 23, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER of service returned unexecuted as to Ronald Lorenzini, filed by Eric A Freeland. (Gorman, Patrick)
January 23, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER of service returned unexecuted as to Lorenzini & Associates, Ltd., filed by Eric A Freeland. (Gorman, Patrick)
January 20, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric A Freeland as to Lorenzini & Associates, Ltd. on 1/18/2020, answer due 2/10/2020. (Gorman, Patrick)
January 20, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric A Freeland as to Ronald N Lorenzini Jr on 1/18/2020, answer due 2/10/2020. (Gorman, Patrick)
January 20, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER of service returned unexecuted as to Ronald Lorenzini, filed by Eric A Freeland. (Gorman, Patrick)
January 20, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER of service returned unexecuted as to Lorenzini & Associates, Ltd., filed by Eric A Freeland. (Gorman, Patrick)
January 3, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Lorenzini & Associates, Ltd., Ronald N Lorenzini Jr (ecw, )
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sara L. Ellis: The initial status conference in this matter is set for 2/4/2020 at 9:30AM. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Ellis' web site and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 1/28/2020. Mailed notice (rj, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (kp, )
December 2, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sara L. Ellis. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Eric A Freeland by Max Phillip Barack (Barack, Max)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Eric A Freeland by Patrick John Gorman (Gorman, Patrick)
December 2, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Eric A Freeland by Andrew H. Haber (Haber, Andrew)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Favaro, Dennis)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Eric A Freeland by Dennis Ray Favaro (Favaro, Dennis)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Eric A Freeland; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16488456.(Favaro, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freeland v. Lorenzini & Associates, Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric A Freeland
Represented By: Max Phillip Barack
Represented By: Andrew H. Haber
Represented By: Dennis Ray Favaro
Represented By: Patrick John Gorman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorenzini & Associates, Ltd.
Represented By: John D. Dalton
Represented By: Mary Kay Morrissey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald N Lorenzini Jr
Represented By: Mary Kay Morrissey
Represented By: John D. Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?