McLaren v. Lagunas et al
Plaintiff: Lamonte McLaren
Defendant: D. Lagunas and Tom Dart
Case Number: 1:2019cv07893
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 MAILED copy of order dated 1/6/20 and copy of complaint #1 to plaintiff. (psm, )
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Plaintiff initiated this action by mailing a complaint #1 , an in forma pauperis application #3 , and a motion for attorney representation #4 . The complaint #1 that Plaintiff mailed to the Court is missing pages: it skips from page three to page six, and is missing a statement of the claim. The Court is therefore unable to conduct the required review under 28 U.S.C. 1915A. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this case, he is must mail a complete copy of his complaint by January 27, 2020. Failure to do so will result in summary dismissal of this case. Plaintiff's in forma pauperis application #3 and motion for attorney representation #4 will be reviewed after receipt of a complete complaint. The Clerk of Court shall mail to Plaintiff a copy of the complaint on file #1 along with a copy of this order. Notices mailed. (psm, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Manish S. Shah for all further proceedings. Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 12/3/2019. (jh, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION by Plaintiff Lamonte McLaren for attorney representation (bg, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Lamonte McLaren for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Exhibits) (bg, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER CIVIL Cover Sheet (bg, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and No copies by Lamonte McLaren (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (Envelope not postmarked) (bg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLaren v. Lagunas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Lagunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Dart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamonte McLaren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?