Smith v. Omron
Plaintiff: Charmaine Smith
Defendant: Omron
Case Number: 1:2019cv08121
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Case called on 1/21/2020 for a hearing as to plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 . Plaintiff did not appear. Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is denied without prejudice. Status hearing is set for 2/25/2020 at 10:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Pro se Plaintiff Charmane Smith brings a "motion for transport at government expense" under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7(b)(1), seeking the costs travel to Chicago from Tennessee to attend the motion hearings in her two lawsuits. Rule 7(b)(1), however, concerns the form of pleadings and has nothing to do with transporting pro se plaintiffs to district courts where they have filed lawsuits. Plaintiff is the "master of her own complaint" and may file it where the court has jurisdiction and where venue is proper. That said, the court (or the public treasury) is not obligated to pay for plaintiff's travel to pursue her lawsuit in another state. See Johnson v. Daley, 339 F.3d 582, 586 (7th Cir. 2003). Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Charmaine Smith for transport at Government's expense F.R.C.P. 7(b)(1). (ym, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing for plaintiff to present her application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, as well as to discuss the allegations in her complaint for the Court's initial screening for pro se complaints under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1) is set for 1/21/2020 at 9:30 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Charmaine Smith. (gcy, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Charmaine Smith for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and affidavit. (gcy, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet. (gcy, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and 0 copies by Charmaine Smith. (gcy, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Omron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charmaine Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?