Arteaga v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Michelle L Arteaga
Defendant: Director Mirash Dedvukaj and Chad F. Wolf
Case Number: 1:2019cv08222
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John J Tharp
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Filing 10 DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Mirash Dedvukaj, Chad F. Wolf (Treacy, Elizabeth)
February 12, 2020 Filing 9 DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants Mirash Dedvukaj, Chad F. Wolf (Oswald, Craig)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 COMPLAINT filed by Michelle L. Arteaga. (Exhibits) (jh, )
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: For the reasons set forth in the Statement below, the Court grants the plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #4 . The plaintiff may proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. The Court also finds that the complaint survives the mandatory screening of in forma pauperis complaints. See Statement for details. Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 1/2/2020. Mailed notice (jh, )
December 26, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Mirash Dedvukaj, Chad F. Wolf, and U.S. Attorney(pj, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Correction regarding #5 . (jh, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 ENTERED IN ERROR. (jh, ) Modified on 12/18/2019 (jh, ).
December 17, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cummings. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
December 17, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. (Avilova, Sofia) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 12/18/2019 (jh, ).
December 17, 2019 Filing 3 RECEIVED COMPLAINT filed by Michelle L Arteaga; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Avilova, Sofia) Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 12/18/2019 (jh, ).
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Michelle L Arteaga by Sofia Avilova (Avilova, Sofia)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Avilova, Sofia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arteaga v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle L Arteaga
Represented By: Sofia Avilova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Mirash Dedvukaj
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Craig Arthur Oswald
Represented By: Elizabeth Inez Treacy
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?