Republic Technologies (NA), LLC et al v. Broniatowski
Plaintiff: SREAM, INC. and Republic Technologies (NA), LLC
Defendant: Pamela Broniatowski
Case Number: 1:2019cv08294
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Pursuant to notice of voluntary dismissal, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Status hearing previously set for 2/25/2020 is stricken. Civil Case Terminated. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 41(a) (Langone, Christopher)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 2/25/20 at 9:00 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (bg, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria, VA (bg, )
December 19, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, SREAM, INC.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Assignment to Republic, #2 Exhibit B: Republic Registration, #3 Exhibit C; License Agreement, #4 Exhibit D; License Agreement, #5 Exhibit E: Product Offered for Sale, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Langone, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Republic Technologies (NA), LLC et al v. Broniatowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Broniatowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SREAM, INC.
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Republic Technologies (NA), LLC
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?