Difatta v. PNC Bank, NA et al
Plaintiff: Edward Difatta
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association and PNC Bank, NA
Case Number: 1:2019cv08313
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Charles R Norgle
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Federal National Mortgage Association, PNC Bank, NA(Sniadanko, Jeffrey)
January 16, 2020 Filing 12 AGREED ORDER Signed by the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr on 1/16/2020. Mailed notice (ph, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: PNC Bank, N.A.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #8 is granted. Enter Agreed Order. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, January 17, 2020. Mailed notice (ewf, )
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant PNC Bank, NA by Gary Eugene Green (Green, Gary)
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Jeffrey M Sniadanko for presentment of extension of time, motion for extension of time to file answer #8 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 1/17/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Sniadanko, Jeffrey)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant PNC Bank, NA for extension of time Unopposed, MOTION by Defendant PNC Bank, NA for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 or to otherwise plead to complaint (Sniadanko, Jeffrey)
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant PNC Bank, NA by Jeffrey M Sniadanko (Sniadanko, Jeffrey)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward Difatta as to Federal National Mortgage Association on 1/6/2020, answer due 1/27/2020. (Goodwin, Tara)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edward Difatta as to PNC Bank, NA on 12/20/2019, answer due 1/10/2020. (Goodwin, Tara)
December 19, 2019 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Federal National Mortgage Association, PNC Bank, NA. (ng, )
December 19, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable David M. Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, )
December 19, 2019 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Edward Difatta by Tara Leigh Goodwin (Goodwin, Tara)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Edward Difatta by Daniel A. Edelman (Edelman, Daniel)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Edelman, Daniel)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Edward Difatta; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16551162. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Edelman, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Difatta v. PNC Bank, NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Jeffrey M Sniadanko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank, NA
Represented By: Gary Eugene Green
Represented By: Jeffrey M Sniadanko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Difatta
Represented By: Tara Leigh Goodwin
Represented By: Daniel A. Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?