Republic Technologies (NA) LLC et al v. Smoke Shop for you XX, INC. et al
Plaintiff: SREAM, INC., Republic Technologies (NA) LLC and Sream, Inc
Defendant: HAMD Kamal, SMOKE SHOP FOR YOU XX, INC. d/b/a SMOKE SHOP PIPES & STUFF and Smoke Shop for you XX, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv08462
Filed: December 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Referring Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: In light of the 03/26/2020 Rule 4(m) deadline for service, the status hearing of 02/11/2020 is reset to 04/01/2020 at 9:30 a.m., with another status report due on 03/26/2020. Mailed notice (mw, )
February 9, 2020 Filing 9 STATUS Report (by Plaintiffs only) by Republic Technologies (NA) LLC, Sream, Inc (Langone, Christopher)
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 02/11/2020 at 9:00 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (mw, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (td, )
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang for all further proceedings. Honorable Marvin E. Aspen no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 1/7/2020. (td, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 E-MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (las, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 E-MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 exhibits)(las, )
December 27, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ecw, )
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet by Republic Technologies (NA) LLC, SREAM, INC. (Langone, Christopher)
December 27, 2019 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Republic Technologies (NA) LLC, SREAM, INC. by Christopher V. Langone (Langone, Christopher)
December 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Republic Technologies (NA) LLC, SREAM, INC.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16567976. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Langone, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Republic Technologies (NA) LLC et al v. Smoke Shop for you XX, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SREAM, INC.
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Republic Technologies (NA) LLC
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HAMD Kamal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMOKE SHOP FOR YOU XX, INC. d/b/a SMOKE SHOP PIPES & STUFF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smoke Shop for you XX, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?