Bartlit Beck LLP v. Okada
Petitioner: Bartlit Beck LLP
Respondent: Kazuo Okada
Case Number: 1:2019cv08508
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Rebecca R Pallmeyer
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9 U.S.C. ยง 9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bartlit Beck LLP as to Kazuo Okada on 2/12/2020, answer due 3/4/2020. (Ackerman, Joshua)
February 11, 2020 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Respondent Kazuo Okada. (ecw, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiff's motion for alternative service #18 is granted. Motion hearing date of 2/11/2020 is stricken. Status hearing set for 2/20/20 is stricken and re-set to 3/24/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
February 6, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Motion by Joshua Phares Ackerman for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, #18 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 2/11/2020 at 08:45 AM. (Ackerman, Joshua)
February 6, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION by Petitioner Bartlit Beck LLP for Alternative Service (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Ackerman Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Berkowitz Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - NV Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Voluntary Dismissal, #5 Exhibit 5 - Ziems LinkedIn, #6 Exhibit 6 - Lind Declaration, #7 Exhibit 7 - O'Hara letter, #8 Exhibit 8 - Peek Dep Excerpts, #9 Exhibit 9 - Query Party)(Ackerman, Joshua)
February 6, 2020 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Sean M. Berkowitz regarding declaration, #7 - Declaration of Sean M. Berkowitz in Support of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Berkowitz, Sean)
February 6, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner Bartlit Beck LLP by Joshua Phares Ackerman (Ackerman, Joshua)
January 7, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Motion hearing held. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion for leave to file under seal #10 is denied without prejudice. Status hearing set for 2/20/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, )
January 3, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner Bartlit Beck LLP by Claudia T. Salomon (Salomon, Claudia)
January 2, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Plaintiff's motion for leave to appear pro hac vice #6 is granted. Attorney Claudia T. Salomon is given leave to file an appearance form on behalf of Plaintiff. Notice mailed by judge's staff (cn).
January 2, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner Bartlit Beck LLP by Katrina Lauren Robinson (Robinson, Katrina)
January 2, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Respondent Kazuo Okada (2 different addresses) (txl, )
December 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Sean M. Berkowitz for presentment of motion for leave to file #10 before Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 1/7/2020 at 08:45 AM. (Berkowitz, Sean)
December 31, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION by Petitioner Bartlit Beck LLP for leave to file Under Seal (Berkowitz, Sean)
December 31, 2019 Filing 9 SEALED EXHIBIT by Petitioner Bartlit Beck LLP - Exhibit B regarding declaration, #7 (Berkowitz, Sean)
December 31, 2019 Filing 8 SEALED EXHIBIT by Petitioner Bartlit Beck LLP - Exhibit A regarding declaration, #7 (Berkowitz, Sean)
December 31, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Sean M. Berkowitz regarding complaint #1 - Declaration of Sean M. Berkowitz in Support of Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Berkowitz, Sean)
December 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16573479. (Salomon, Claudia)
December 31, 2019 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kl, )
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner Bartlit Beck LLP by Adam L. Hoeflich (Hoeflich, Adam)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Bartlit Beck LLP (Berkowitz, Sean)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Petitioner Bartlit Beck LLP by Sean M. Berkowitz (Berkowitz, Sean)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Berkowitz, Sean)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award filed by Bartlit Beck LLP; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16572282.(Berkowitz, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartlit Beck LLP v. Okada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kazuo Okada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bartlit Beck LLP
Represented By: Adam L. Hoeflich
Represented By: Sean M. Berkowitz
Represented By: Claudia T. Salomon
Represented By: Joshua Phares Ackerman
Represented By: Katrina Lauren Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?