Central Grocers, Inc. et al v. Coari et al
Plaintiff: Strack and Vantil Supermarkets, Inc., Central Grocers, Inc. and SVT, LLC
Defendant: Robertino Presta, John Sullivan, John Kotara, Lavelle Law, Ltd., Kenneth Nemeth, John Cortesi, Joseph Kumkoski, Timothy Kubis, Anthony Del Pra, John Regas, Robert Lee, Maria Kamberos, Kerry Lavelle, John Coari, John Lagestee, Sr., Alfredo Linares, James Dremonas, James Robertson, Frank Kumkoski and Tony Ingraffia
Trustee: Howard B. Samuels
Case Number: 1:2020cv00163
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert W Gettleman
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 FINAL closing order dated 3/4/2020 entered on USBC docket. (pk, )
March 4, 2020 Filing 23 ENTERED JUDGMENT. Mailed notice(pk, )
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: Defendants' motion to withdraw the reference #1 is denied. See order for further details. Signed by the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 3/4/2020. Mailed notice(pk, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY by Alfredo Linares, John Coari, John Cortesi, Anthony Del Pra, James Dremonas, Tony Ingraffia, Maria Kamberos, John Kotara, Timothy Kubis, Frank Kumkoski, Joseph Kumkoski, John Lagestee, Sr., Kerry Lavelle, Lavelle Law, Ltd., Robert Lee, Kenneth Nemeth, Robertino Presta, John Regas, James Robertson, John Sullivan to response in opposition to motion #18 (Floyd, Mason)
January 29, 2020 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Attorney Eric Madden's motion to appear pro hac vice #19 is granted. Mailed notice (cn).
January 29, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16666411. (Madden, Eric)
January 28, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE by Central Grocers, Inc., SVT, LLC, Howard B. Samuels, Strack and Vantil Supermarkets, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION to withdraw reference #1 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(King, John)
January 21, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman: Motion hearing held on 1/21/2020. Trustee's response to Defendants' motion to withdraw reference #1 due by 1/28/2020, defendants' reply due 2/11/2020. Attorney J. Benjamin King's motion to appear pro hac vice is granted. Status hearing set for 4/14/2020 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (cn).
January 17, 2020 Filing 16 OBJECTIONS by Central Grocers, Inc., SVT, LLC, Strack and Vantil Supermarkets, Inc., Howard B. Samuels to MOTION to withdraw reference #1 , notice of motion #9 (King, John)
January 17, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16627810. (King, John)
January 16, 2020 Filing 14 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central Grocers, Inc., SVT, LLC, Strack and Vantil Supermarkets, Inc. by Michael Marc Eidelman (Eidelman, Michael)
January 16, 2020 Filing 13 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central Grocers, Inc., SVT, LLC, Strack and Vantil Supermarkets, Inc. by Allison Hudson (Hudson, Allison)
January 16, 2020 Filing 12 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Central Grocers, Inc., SVT, LLC, Strack and Vantil Supermarkets, Inc. by William W. Thorsness, III (Thorsness, William)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant James Dremonas by Zachary Mulcrone (Mulcrone, Zachary)
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant James Dremonas by Adam Brent Rome (Rome, Adam)
January 13, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Leigh D. Roadman for presentment of motion to withdraw reference #1 before Honorable Robert W. Gettleman on 1/21/2020 at 09:15 AM. (Roadman, Leigh)
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Timothy Kubis by Karl Richard Barnickol (Barnickol, Karl)
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Timothy Kubis by Robert Radasevich (Radasevich, Robert)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Cortesi by Richard Arthur Bixter, jr (Bixter, Richard)
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant John Cortesi by Richard R. Winter (Winter, Richard)
January 10, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Alfredo Linares, John Coari, Anthony Del Pra, Tony Ingraffia, Maria Kamberos, John Kotara, Frank Kumkoski, Joseph Kumkoski, John Lagestee, Sr., Kerry Lavelle, Lavelle Law, Ltd., Robert Lee, Kenneth Nemeth, Robertino Presta, John Regas, James Robertson by Mason N. Floyd (Floyd, Mason)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Alfredo Linares, John Coari, Anthony Del Pra, Tony Ingraffia, Maria Kamberos, John Kotara, Frank Kumkoski, Joseph Kumkoski, John Lagestee, Sr., Kerry Lavelle, Lavelle Law, Ltd., Robert Lee, Kenneth Nemeth, Robertino Presta, John Regas, James Robertson by Leigh D. Roadman (Roadman, Leigh)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 MAILED Rule 83.16 letter with an attorney appearance form to all counsel of record. (pk, )
January 9, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to withdraw reference (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal Letter, #3 Docket Sheet)(USBC-Rivera, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central Grocers, Inc. et al v. Coari et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robertino Presta
Represented By: Mason N. Floyd
Represented By: Leigh D. Roadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Kotara
Represented By: Mason N. Floyd
Represented By: Leigh D. Roadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lavelle Law, Ltd.
Represented By: Mason N. Floyd
Represented By: Leigh D. Roadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Nemeth
Represented By: Mason N. Floyd
Represented By: Leigh D. Roadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cortesi
Represented By: Richard R. Winter
Represented By: Richard Arthur Bixter, jr
Represented By: Leigh D. Roadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Kumkoski
Represented By: Mason N. Floyd
Represented By: Leigh D. Roadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Kubis
Represented By: Karl Richard Barnickol
Represented By: Robert Radasevich
Represented By: Leigh D. Roadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Del Pra
Represented By: Mason N. Floyd
Represented By: Leigh D. Roadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Regas
Represented By: Mason N. Floyd
Represented By: Leigh D. Roadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Lee
Represented By: Mason N. Floyd
Represented By: Leigh D. Roadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Kamberos
Represented By: Mason N. Floyd
Represented By: Leigh D. Roadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry Lavelle
Represented By: Mason N. Floyd
Represented By: Leigh D. Roadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Coari
Represented By: Mason N. Floyd
Represented By: Leigh D. Roadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lagestee, Sr.
Represented By: Mason N. Floyd
Represented By: Leigh D. Roadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfredo Linares
Represented By: Mason N. Floyd
Represented By: Leigh D. Roadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dremonas
Represented By: Zachary Mulcrone
Represented By: Adam Brent Rome
Represented By: Leigh D. Roadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Robertson
Represented By: Mason N. Floyd
Represented By: Leigh D. Roadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Kumkoski
Represented By: Mason N. Floyd
Represented By: Leigh D. Roadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Ingraffia
Represented By: Mason N. Floyd
Represented By: Leigh D. Roadman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strack and Vantil Supermarkets, Inc.
Represented By: Eric D Madden
Represented By: Allison Hudson
Represented By: Michael Marc Eidelman
Represented By: John Benjamin King
Represented By: William W. Thorsness, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Grocers, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Hudson
Represented By: Michael Marc Eidelman
Represented By: William W. Thorsness, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SVT, LLC
Represented By: Eric D Madden
Represented By: Allison Hudson
Represented By: Michael Marc Eidelman
Represented By: John Benjamin King
Represented By: William W. Thorsness, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Howard B. Samuels
Represented By: Eric D Madden
Represented By: John Benjamin King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?