Paprosky v. MCZ Development Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Paprosky
Defendant: Mr. Michael J. Lerner and MCZ Development Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00218
Filed: January 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sharon Johnson Coleman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1819
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Michael J. Lerner, MCZ Development Corp. by Allen H. Shapiro (Shapiro, Allen)
March 9, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing set for 3/20/2020 is stricken and reset to 4/17/2020 at 9:00 AM. The parties are reminded to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. Mailed notice. (ym, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie Paprosky as to Michael J. Lerner on 3/5/2020, answer due 3/26/2020. (Rossiello, Ernest)
March 3, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie Paprosky as to MCZ Development Corp. on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (Rossiello, Ernest)
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie Paprosky as to MCZ Development Corp. on 2/5/2020, answer due 2/26/2020. (Rossiello, Ernest)
January 22, 2020 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant MCZ Development Corp.. (txl, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing set for 3/16/2020 is stricken and reset to 3/20/2020 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 16, 2020 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant Michael J. Lerner. (txl, )
January 16, 2020 ALIAS Summons Issued as to Defendant MCZ Development Corp.. (txl, )
January 14, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Status hearing is set for 3/16/2020 at 9:00 AM. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendants of the status hearing forthwith. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, )
January 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rossiello, Ernest)
January 13, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
January 13, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Michael J. Lerner (txl, )
January 13, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant MCZ Development Corp. (txl, )
January 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Stephanie Paprosky; JURY DEMAND. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16607138.(Rossiello, Ernest)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paprosky v. MCZ Development Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Michael J. Lerner
Represented By: Allen H. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCZ Development Corp.
Represented By: Allen H. Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Paprosky
Represented By: Ernest Thomas Rossiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?