Dobrov v. Hi-Tech Paintless Dent Repair, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Taras Dobrov
Defendant: President Mark Tsurkis, Hi-Tech Paintless Dent Repair, Inc. and Mark Tsurkis
Case Number: 1:2020cv00314
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Edmond E Chang
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2020 Filing 17 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Any party wishing to appear by phone may email a request with a direct-dial phone number to the courtroom deputy, michael_wing@ilnd.uscourts.gov, by 03/16/2020 at 1:00 p.mEmailed notice (Chang, Edmond)
March 13, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: On the Court's own initiative, Defendants' motion for extension of time to answer or otherwise plead set for 03/17/2020 at 9:45 a.m. is reset to 10:00 a.m. on the same date. Mailed notice (mw, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Neal Fritzshall for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #14 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 3/17/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Fritzshall, Steven)
March 5, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendants Hi-Tech Paintless Dent Repair, Inc., Mark Tsurkis for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint #1 (Fritzshall, Steven)
March 2, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Taras Dobrov as to All Defendants. (Becvar, Teresa)
March 2, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Defendants' extension motion to answer #10 is denied without prejudice for two reasons. First, there is no statement of conferral, as required by the Court's Case Management Procedures. Second, the motion asks for a 45-day extension, but from what date? The answer deadline is not reported in the motion. And there is no return of service or waiver of service on the docket. If service had been accomplished or a waiver received, Plaintiff has not filed it on the docket. Defendants are free to refile the motion after conferral; the new motion must specify the proposed answer deadline. Mailed notice (mw, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by Steven Neal Fritzshall for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #10 before Honorable Edmond E. Chang on 3/3/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Fritzshall, Steven)
February 19, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION by Defendants Hi-Tech Paintless Dent Repair, Inc., Mark Tsurkis for extension of time to file answer (Fritzshall, Steven)
February 19, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Hi-Tech Paintless Dent Repair, Inc., Mark Tsurkis by Brad J. Pawlowski (Pawlowski, Brad)
February 19, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Hi-Tech Paintless Dent Repair, Inc., Mark Tsurkis by Steven Neal Fritzshall (Fritzshall, Steven)
January 28, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: : Initial status hearing set for 03/24/2020 at 9:15 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (mw, )
January 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
January 16, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Hi-Tech Paintless Dent Repair, Inc., Mark Tsurkis (txl, )
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Taras Dobrov by Teresa M. Becvar (Becvar, Teresa)
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Taras Dobrov by James B. Zouras (Zouras, James)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Taras Dobrov by Ryan F Stephan (Stephan, Ryan)
January 15, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Becvar, Teresa)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Taras Dobrov; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16620565. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Becvar, Teresa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dobrov v. Hi-Tech Paintless Dent Repair, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taras Dobrov
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Represented By: Teresa M. Becvar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: President Mark Tsurkis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hi-Tech Paintless Dent Repair, Inc.
Represented By: Steven Neal Fritzshall
Represented By: Brad J. Pawlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Tsurkis
Represented By: Steven Neal Fritzshall
Represented By: Brad J. Pawlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?