Republic Technologies (NA), LLC et al v. D&S Tobacco N More Inc. et al
Plaintiff: REPUBLIC TECHNOLOGIES (NA), LLC and SREAM, INC
Defendant: PANKAJ DINESH SHAH and D&S TOBACCO N MORE INC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00431
Filed: January 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Martha M Pacold
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Sream, Inc.. (Langone, Christopher)
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Sream, Inc.. All Defendants. (Langone, Christopher)
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Sream, Inc.. All Defendants. (Langone, Christopher)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Martha M. Pacold: The parties are directed to file a joint status report by 4/16/2020. Status hearing set for 4/23/2020 at 9:45 a.m. (Attachments: #1 Initial Status Report outline) (rao, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (gcy, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (gcy, )
January 21, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Martha M. Pacold. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
January 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Damages filed by REPUBLIC TECHNOLOGIES (NA), LLC, SREAM, INC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16632908. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Langone, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Republic Technologies (NA), LLC et al v. D&S Tobacco N More Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PANKAJ DINESH SHAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D&S TOBACCO N MORE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REPUBLIC TECHNOLOGIES (NA), LLC
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SREAM, INC
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?