Republic Technologies (NA), LLC et al v. Maxtra Inc. et al
Plaintiff: SREAM, INC. and REPUBLIC TECHNOLOGIES (NA), LLC
Defendant: AHMED QURESHI and MAXTRA INC d/b/a TOBACCO CIGARS
Case Number: 1:2020cv00432
Filed: January 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John F Kness
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER : STANDING ORDER REGARDING REASSIGNED CIVIL CASES: This Standing Order applies to all civil cases reassigned as of February 28, 2020 to the calendar of District Judge John F. Kness. Unless otherwise ordered: (1) all previously-set status or motion hearing dates are vacated; (2) any trials or evidentiary hearings scheduled between March 9, 2020 and May 1, 2020 are continued and will be re-set by the Court at a future hearing; and (3) all other previously-set deadlines and schedules (other than hearing dates) shall remain in effect. See Order for details. Signed by the Honorable John F. Kness on 3/9/2020: Mailed notice. (tg, )
February 28, 2020 Filing 4 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 20-0008 Pursuant that to the Executive Committee Order entered on February 24, 2020 the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable John F. Kness; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 313 cases be reassigned to the Honorable John F. Kness; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable John F. Kness' webpage on the Court's website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order will not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable John F. Kness to the Court's civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that he shall receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable John F. Kness for all further proceedings. Honorable Robert W. Gettleman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 2/28/2020.(tg, )
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (jh, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (jh, )
January 21, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert W. Gettleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
January 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Damages filed by REPUBLIC TECHNOLOGIES (NA), LLC, SREAM, INC.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16632917. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Langone, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Republic Technologies (NA), LLC et al v. Maxtra Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AHMED QURESHI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAXTRA INC d/b/a TOBACCO CIGARS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SREAM, INC.
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REPUBLIC TECHNOLOGIES (NA), LLC
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?