Republic Technologies (NA), LLC et al v. Mega Convenience Corp et al
Plaintiff: REPUBLIC TECHNOLOGIES (NA), LLC and SREAM, INC
Defendant: MEGA CONVENIENCE CORP d/b/a CHANNAHON CONVENIENCE & TOBACCO and WALID KHALED SALEH
Case Number: 1:2020cv00433
Filed: January 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Pursuant to the Amended General Order dated 3/16/20, status hearing previously set for 3/17/20 is stricken and reset to 4/8/20 at 9:30 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: At the Plaintiffs' request, Initial status hearing previously set for 2/27/20 is stricken and reset to 3/17/20 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: Initial status hearing set for 2/27/20 at 9:30 a.m. Parties shall review and comply with Judge Alonso's Standing Order on The Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project on his website. Notices mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
January 29, 2020 Filing 4 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (ph, )
January 29, 2020 Filing 3 MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 (List of Trademarks)) (ph, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, )
January 21, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
January 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Damages filed by REPUBLIC TECHNOLOGIES (NA), LLC, SREAM, INC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16632923. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Langone, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Republic Technologies (NA), LLC et al v. Mega Convenience Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MEGA CONVENIENCE CORP d/b/a CHANNAHON CONVENIENCE & TOBACCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALID KHALED SALEH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REPUBLIC TECHNOLOGIES (NA), LLC
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SREAM, INC
Represented By: Christopher V. Langone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?