Handel v. MacLean-Fogg Component Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: Timothy Handel
Defendant: MacLean-Fogg Component Solutions, LLC, d/b/a Metform, LLC d/b/a MacLean Fogg Company and MacLean-Fogg Component Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00711
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: John Z Lee
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 18 TRANSFERRED the case record to the Western Division 20cv50068. (jp, )
February 14, 2020 Filing 17 DIVISIONAL TRANSFER Notice. Case transferred to Western Division - Rockford. #16 (bg, )
February 14, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: In accordance with the parties' request and based upon the facts submitted therein, this case is transferred to the Western Division of the Northern District of Illinois. The clerk should transfer this case to the Western Division forthwith. Mailed notice (cn).
February 12, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by Taylor Nicole Rollinson for presentment of motion to transfer case #14 before Honorable John Z. Lee on 2/18/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Rollinson, Taylor)
February 12, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant MacLean-Fogg Component Solutions, LLC to transfer case (AGREED) (Rollinson, Taylor)
February 10, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Catlett, Cyle)
February 10, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE Certification by Plaintiff's Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Doak, John)
February 7, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project (Rollinson, Taylor)
February 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by MacLean-Fogg Component Solutions, LLC Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rollinson, Taylor)
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by MacLean-Fogg Component Solutions, LLC(Rollinson, Taylor)
February 6, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Z. Lee: Initial status hearing set for 3/26/20 at 9:00 a.m. Judge Lee participates in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project ("Project"). The Project applies to all cases filed on or after June 1, 2017, excluding the following: (1) cases exempted by Rule 26(a)(1)(B), (2) actions brought by a person in the custody of the United States, a state, or a state subdivision, regardless of whether an attorney is recruited, (3) actions under the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act, (4) patent cases governed by the Local Patent Rules, and (5) cases transferred for consolidated administration in the District by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("Exempt Cases").For all cases to which the Project applies, Judge Lee requires (1) each attorney appearing on behalf of Plaintiff(s) to file a "Certification by Attorney Regarding Discovery Obligations Under Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" form within 28 days after the filing of the Complaint and (2) each attorney appearing on behalf of Defendant(s) to file the certification form with the Answer. The parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing. The certification form and initial status report requirements are set forth in Judge Lee's standing order regarding the "Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" available on the Courts website. For all Exempt Cases, the parties are directed to file a joint initial status report four business days prior to the initial status hearing in accordance with the standing order governing "Initial Status Report in Cases Exempt from the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project" also available on the Court's website. Mailed notice (ca, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Timothy Handel by John Frederick Doak (Doak, John)
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, )
February 3, 2020 Filing 5 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (bg, )
January 31, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Z. Lee. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable David M. Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
January 31, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rollinson, Taylor)
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MacLean-Fogg Component Solutions, LLC, d/b/a Metform, LLC d/b/a MacLean Fogg Company by Cyle Reginald Catlett (Catlett, Cyle)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant MacLean-Fogg Component Solutions, LLC, d/b/a Metform, LLC d/b/a MacLean Fogg Company by Taylor Nicole Rollinson (Rollinson, Taylor)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Fifteenth Judicial Circuit Carroll County IL, case number (2019L8) filed by MacLean-Fogg Component Solutions, LLC, d/b/a Metform, LLC d/b/a MacLean Fogg Company Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16675434. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rollinson, Taylor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Handel v. MacLean-Fogg Component Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MacLean-Fogg Component Solutions, LLC, d/b/a Metform, LLC d/b/a MacLean Fogg Company
Represented By: Taylor Nicole Rollinson
Represented By: Cyle Reginald Catlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MacLean-Fogg Component Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Taylor Nicole Rollinson
Represented By: Cyle Reginald Catlett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Handel
Represented By: John Frederick Doak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?