True Manufacturing Co., Inc. v. LG Electronics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: True Manufacturing Co., Inc.
Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc. and LG Electronics USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00730
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2020 Filing 23 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: At the Court's instance, and pursuant to General Order 20-0012, as amended, the status hearing set for 4/2/2020 is vacated and reset to 4/30/2020 at 9:00 AM. The status hearing will be conducted by telephone, and counsel are to arrange for a call-in number and are to advise chambers of the necessary call-in information by 4/28/2020. The parties are directed to file, by 4/24/2020, a joint status report including the following information: (1) a description of the parties' claims and defenses; (2) the status of any discussions regarding settlement, including the history of demands and offers; (3) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (4) any other matters that the parties wish to bring to the Court's attention. The deadline for the status report will not be affected by General Order 20-0012 or any other similar order entered hereafter. (mk)
March 17, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16847303. (Smith, Morgan)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Initial status hearing is set to 9:00 a.m. on 4/2/2020 before Judge Kennelly, in Chambers, Room 2188. Parties are to review and comply with Judge Kennelly's standing initial order, which may be found on his web page, located at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/_forms/_JUDGES/KENNELLY/INIT-ORD.htm. Counsel for plaintiff(s) are ordered to cause a copy of this order to be delivered forthwith to each defendant who has not yet appeared by counsel in the same manner that summons has been or is being served on each defendant. (mk)
March 2, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint by LG Electronics USA, Inc.(Murray, Lynn)
March 2, 2020 Filing 18 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by LG Electronics USA, Inc. (Murray, Lynn)
March 2, 2020 Filing 17 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant LG Electronics USA, Inc. by Erika Anne Dirk (Dirk, Erika)
March 2, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant LG Electronics USA, Inc. by Lynn Hagman Murray (Murray, Lynn)
February 25, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Compliance under Lanham Act Mediation Program (Retsky, Jonathan)
February 18, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by True Manufacturing Co., Inc. as to LG Electronics USA, Inc. on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Trubac, Steven)
February 9, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Motion of Nicole Grembocki, Matthew Minder and James Clark to appear pro hac vice #7 #9 #11 are granted. (mk)
February 5, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Motion by James Bennett Clark for presentment of motion to appear pro hac vice #11 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/12/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Clark, James)
February 5, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16695180. (Clark, James)
February 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Motion by Matthew J. Minder for presentment of motion to appear pro hac vice #9 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/12/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Minder, Matthew)
February 5, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16695037. (Minder, Matthew)
February 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Motion by Nicole L. Grembocki for presentment of motion to appear pro hac vice #7 before Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 2/12/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Grembocki, Nicole)
February 5, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16694910. (Grembocki, Nicole)
February 4, 2020 Filing 6 MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (aee, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 5 MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (Attachments: #1 Trademarks)(aee, )
January 31, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants LG Electronics USA, Inc., LG Electronics, Inc. (daj, )
January 31, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, )
January 31, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff True Manufacturing Co., Inc. by Steven Gordon Trubac (Trubac, Steven)
January 31, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff True Manufacturing Co., Inc. by Jonathan E. Retsky (Retsky, Jonathan)
January 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Retsky, Jonathan)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by True Manufacturing Co., Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16677056. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Retsky, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: True Manufacturing Co., Inc. v. LG Electronics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LG Electronics USA, Inc.
Represented By: Erika Anne Dirk
Represented By: Morgan Elizabeth Smith
Represented By: Lynn Hagman Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: True Manufacturing Co., Inc.
Represented By: Steven Gordon Trubac
Represented By: Jonathan E. Retsky
Represented By: Matthew J. Minder
Represented By: Nicole L. Grembocki
Represented By: James Bennett Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?