WestRock Company et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: WestRock Southeast, LLC, WestRock Virginia, LLC, WestRock Company of Canada Corp./Compagnie WestRock du Canada Corp., WestRock-Rex, LLC, WestRock Northwest, LLC, WestRock Mill Company, LLC, WestRock Company, WestRock Container, LLC, WestRock Kraft Paper, LLC, WestRock Texas, L.P., WestRock Longview, LLC, WestRock Minnesota Corporation, WestRock-Solvay, LLC, WestRock CP, LLC and WestRock Coated Board, LLC
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Company and BNSF Railway Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00754
Filed: February 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Robert M Dow
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 ELECTRONIC Acknowledgement of case transferred to the District of Columbia as case 1:20-cv-00482, filed 02/20/2020. (kp, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 14 TRANSFERRED to the USDC District of Columbia the electronic record. (sxb, )
February 19, 2020 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2925 Conditional Transfer Order filed 2/19/2020. (sxb, )
February 19, 2020 Filing 13 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to USDC District of Columbia. (sxb, )
February 10, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Potential Tag-Along Actions as to MDL No. 2925 (Exhibits) (sxb, )
February 5, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WestRock Kraft Paper, LLC, WestRock Southeast, LLC, WestRock Coated Board, LLC, WestRock Company, WestRock Longview, LLC, WestRock Company of Canada Corp./Compagnie WestRock du Canada Corp., WestRock Virginia, LLC, WestRock Mill Company, LLC, WestRock Container, LLC, WestRock-Rex, LLC, WestRock-Solvay, LLC, WestRock Northwest, LLC, WestRock Texas, L.P., WestRock Minnesota Corporation, WestRock CP, LLC as to Norfolk Southern Railway Company on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (Schapiro, Andrew)
February 4, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WestRock Kraft Paper, LLC, WestRock Southeast, LLC, WestRock Coated Board, LLC, WestRock Company, WestRock Longview, LLC, WestRock Company of Canada Corp./Compagnie WestRock du Canada Corp., WestRock Virginia, LLC, WestRock Mill Company, LLC, WestRock Container, LLC, WestRock-Rex, LLC, WestRock-Solvay, LLC, WestRock Northwest, LLC, WestRock Texas, L.P., WestRock Minnesota Corporation, WestRock CP, LLC as to Union Pacific Railroad Company on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (Schapiro, Andrew)
February 4, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WestRock Kraft Paper, LLC, WestRock Southeast, LLC, WestRock Coated Board, LLC, WestRock Company, WestRock Longview, LLC, WestRock Company of Canada Corp./Compagnie WestRock du Canada Corp., WestRock Virginia, LLC, WestRock Mill Company, LLC, WestRock Container, LLC, WestRock-Rex, LLC, WestRock-Solvay, LLC, WestRock Northwest, LLC, WestRock Texas, L.P., WestRock Minnesota Corporation, WestRock CP, LLC as to CSX Transportation, Inc. on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (Schapiro, Andrew)
February 4, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by WestRock Kraft Paper, LLC, WestRock Southeast, LLC, WestRock Coated Board, LLC, WestRock Company, WestRock Longview, LLC, WestRock Company of Canada Corp./Compagnie WestRock du Canada Corp., WestRock Virginia, LLC, WestRock Mill Company, LLC, WestRock Container, LLC, WestRock-Rex, LLC, WestRock-Solvay, LLC, WestRock Northwest, LLC, WestRock Texas, L.P., WestRock Minnesota Corporation, WestRock CP, LLC as to BNSF Railway Company on 2/4/2020, answer due 2/25/2020. (Schapiro, Andrew)
February 3, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 3/10/2020 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least three days prior to the initial status and all further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
February 3, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for 3/10/2020 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least three days prior to the initial status and all further status hearings. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, )
February 3, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Company, and Union Pacific Railroad Company. (acm, )
February 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, )
February 3, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
February 1, 2020 Filing 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by All Plaintiffs Corporate Disclosure Statement (Schapiro, Andrew)
February 1, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs WestRock CP, LLC, WestRock Coated Board, LLC, WestRock Company, WestRock Company of Canada Corp./Compagnie WestRock du Canada Corp., WestRock Container, LLC, WestRock Kraft Paper, LLC, WestRock Longview, LLC, WestRock Mill Company, LLC, WestRock Minnesota Corporation, WestRock Northwest, LLC, WestRock Southeast, LLC, WestRock Texas, L.P., WestRock Virginia, LLC, WestRock-Rex, LLC, WestRock-Solvay, LLC by Andrew H. Schapiro (Schapiro, Andrew)
February 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit Related Cases)(Schapiro, Andrew)
February 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by WestRock Company of Canada Corp./Compagnie WestRock du Canada Corp., WestRock Kraft Paper, LLC, WestRock Virginia, LLC, WestRock Southeast, LLC, WestRock Mill Company, LLC, WestRock Container, LLC, WestRock Coated Board, LLC, WestRock-Solvay, LLC, WestRock-Rex, LLC, WestRock Northwest, LLC, WestRock Texas, L.P., WestRock Company, WestRock Minnesota Corporation, WestRock Longview, LLC, WestRock CP, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16680246.(Schapiro, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WestRock Company et al v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WestRock Southeast, LLC
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WestRock Virginia, LLC
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WestRock Company of Canada Corp./Compagnie WestRock du Canada Corp.
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WestRock-Rex, LLC
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WestRock Northwest, LLC
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WestRock Mill Company, LLC
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WestRock Company
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WestRock Container, LLC
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WestRock Kraft Paper, LLC
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WestRock Texas, L.P.
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WestRock Longview, LLC
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WestRock Minnesota Corporation
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WestRock-Solvay, LLC
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WestRock CP, LLC
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WestRock Coated Board, LLC
Represented By: Andrew H. Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?