Lorden v. Richards-Wilcox, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Lorden
Defendant: Richards-Wilcox, Inc., Manfred Haiderer and Robert McMurtry
Case Number: 1:2020cv00814
Filed: February 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Gary Feinerman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Preliminary settlement discussion with lead counsel is reinstated for 4/6/2020 at 10:00 a.m. Lead counsel are instructed to promptly call into the Court's conference call-in number at (888) 684-8852, and use Access Code 7354516. Mailed notice (lxs, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket2, )
March 29, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Preliminary settlement discussion with lead counsel previously set for 4/6/2020 is stricken. Status hearing set for 5/12/2020 at 09:15 AM. Mailed notice (lxs, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 16 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Manfred Haiderer, Robert McMurtry, Richards-Wilcox, Inc. by Jody Wilner Moran (Moran, Jody)
March 4, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Initial status hearing held. A preliminary settlement discussion with lead counsel is set for 4/6/2020 at 10:00 a.m. by telephone. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call to Defendants' counsel and promptly contact chambers at (312) 435-3000. Plaintiff's settlement letter is due by 3/13/2020. Defendants' settlement letter is due by 3/24/2020. Counsel cannot agree to amend the letter exchange deadlines amongst themselves. Parties are reminded that Magistrate Judge Harjani requires compliance with his Standing Order for Settlement Conference, which is available on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (lxs, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: Counsel's request to reset initial status hearing previously set for 3/3/2020 to 3/4/2020 at 9:15 a.m. is granted. Mailed notice (lxs, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: This case has been referred to Judge Harjani to conduct a settlement conference. Initial status hearing is set for 3/3/2020 at 9:15 a.m. in Courtroom 1858 to set a settlement conference. Mailed notice (lxs, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 12 Pursuant to Local Rule 72.1, this case is hereby referred to the calendar of Honorable Sunil R. Harjani for the purpose of holding proceedings related to: settlement conference.Mailed notice.(jlj, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:At the parties' request, this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Harjani for a settlement conference.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:MIDP disclosures shall be served by 5/6/2020, unless excused by the MIDP Standing Order. The status hearing set for 3/10/2020 #6 is stricken. Initial status hearing set for 5/28/2020 at 9:00 a.m. The parties shall file an initial joint status report by 5/21/2020.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Daniel Lorden. Robert McMurtry waiver sent on 2/5/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (Mustoe, Elisabeth)
February 20, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Daniel Lorden. Manfred Haiderer waiver sent on 2/5/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (Mustoe, Elisabeth)
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Daniel Lorden. Richards-Wilcox, Inc. waiver sent on 2/5/2020, answer due 4/6/2020. (Mustoe, Elisabeth)
February 10, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 3/10/2020 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
February 4, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )
February 4, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Daniel Lorden by Brenda H. Feis (Feis, Brenda)
February 4, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Daniel Lorden by Elisabeth Grace Mustoe (Mustoe, Elisabeth)
February 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mustoe, Elisabeth)
February 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Daniel Lorden; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16688292. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Mustoe, Elisabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lorden v. Richards-Wilcox, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richards-Wilcox, Inc.
Represented By: Jody Wilner Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manfred Haiderer
Represented By: Jody Wilner Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert McMurtry
Represented By: Jody Wilner Moran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Lorden
Represented By: Elisabeth Grace Mustoe
Represented By: Brenda H. Feis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?