Line Construction Benefit Fund, a Health and Welfare Fund v. RGC General Engineering, Inc.
Plaintiff: Line Construction Benefit Fund, a Health and Welfare Fund
Defendant: RGC General Engineering, Inc., a California Corporation and RGC General Engineering, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00860
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket12, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) , filed by Plaintiff Line Construction Benefit Fund, a Health and Welfare Fund. (Hensel, Sam)
March 4, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Line Construction Benefit Fund, a Health and Welfare Fund as to RGC General Engineering, Inc. on 2/25/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. (Jarka, Matthew)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Status hearing set for 4/16/2020 at 09:00 AM. The filing of a joint status report is not required.Mailed notice (srn, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (bg, )
February 7, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant RGC General Engineering, Inc., a California Corporation (txl, )
February 6, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ecw, )
February 6, 2020 Filing 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Line Construction Benefit Fund, a Health and Welfare Fund by Sam Hensel (Hensel, Sam)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Line Construction Benefit Fund, a Health and Welfare Fund by Robert B. Greenberg (Greenberg, Robert)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Line Construction Benefit Fund, a Health and Welfare Fund by Matthew Scott Jarka (Jarka, Matthew)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Jarka, Matthew)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Line Construction Benefit Fund, a Health and Welfare Fund; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16696948.(Jarka, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Line Construction Benefit Fund, a Health and Welfare Fund v. RGC General Engineering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RGC General Engineering, Inc., a California Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RGC General Engineering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Line Construction Benefit Fund, a Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Robert B. Greenberg
Represented By: Matthew Scott Jarka
Represented By: Sam Hensel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?