United States of America v. Davis
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES and United States of America
Defendant: Daniel E Davis
Case Number: 1:2020cv01012
Filed: February 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Sheila M Finnegan
Referring Judge: Virginia M Kendall
Nature of Suit: Tax Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Filing 49 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Teleconference Status hearing held on 9/13/2021. The Government reports they received the requested records from Defense Counsel and are in the process of reviewing them. Teleconference Status hearing set for 10/12/2021 at 9:15 AM. Prior to the conference call, you are directed to click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
August 12, 2021 Filing 48 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Teleconference Status hearing held on 8/12/2021. The Government reports that Defendant has produced records and they are in the process of reviewing documents. Teleconference Status hearing set for 9/13/2021 at 9:15 AM. Prior to the conference call, you are directed to click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
August 11, 2021 Filing 47 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Teleconference Status hearing set for 8/12/2021 is reset for 9:15 AM (PLEASE NOTE TIME CHANGE ONLY). Mailed notice (lk, )
July 28, 2021 Filing 46 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. On the Court's own Motion, Teleconference Status hearing is reset for 8/12/2021 at 9:00 AM. Prior to the conference call, you are directed to click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
July 20, 2021 Filing 45 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Telephone hearing held on 7/20/2021 as to Petitioner's motion to compel native Quickbooks reports #25 . For reasons stated on the record, the motion is granted and Respondent is ordered to produce the native Quickbook reports described in the motion. Respondent's request for 21 days (until 8/10/2021) to produce the reports is granted without objection. All matters relating to the referral have been completed so the referral is closed. Mailed notice (sxw)
July 20, 2021 Filing 44 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Teleconference Status hearing set for 7/21/2021 is reset for 8/3/2021 at 9:15 AM. Prior to the conference call, you are directed to click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
July 19, 2021 Filing 43 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: The telephone hearing set on on 7/19/2021 is cancelled and reset to 7/20/2021 at 4:00 p.m. The toll-free number for the next hearing is 877-336-1831, access code 5995354. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the prohibition against recording and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Mailed notice (sxw)
July 14, 2021 Filing 42 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Continued telephone hearing held on 7/14/2021 as to Petitioner's motion to compel native Quickbooks reports #25 . Without objection, the Court read into the record the letter emailed from defense counsel dated 7/6/2021 that accompanied the two excel spreadsheets provided for in-camera review. The Court also described the categories of information contained in the spreadsheets and posed questions about whether and how the spreadsheets reveal any attorney-client communications or attorney work product. The Court expects to rule on the motion on 7/19/2021 at 11:30 a.m. by telephone. The toll-free number for the next hearing is 877-336-1831, access code 5995354. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the prohibition against recording and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Mailed notice (sxw)
July 6, 2021 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Michael H. Frazin regarding motion to compel #25 (Terman, Sarah)
June 25, 2021 Filing 40 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Defendant's unopposed request for extension of time to provide native QuickBooks files to the Court for in camera inspection is granted. Defendant shall provide the materials by 7/6/2021. Telephone status hearing is reset to 7/14/2021 at 10:45 a.m. The toll-free number for the next hearing is 877-336-1831, access code 5995354. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the prohibition against recording and rebroadcasting of court proceedings.Mailed notice (sxw, )
June 22, 2021 Filing 39 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: By 6/25/2021, Defendant shall provide to the Court for in camera inspection the five QuickBooks accounting reports in their native format that are sought in Plaintiff's motion to compel #25 . These may be provided in hard copy, by email (chambers_finnegan@ilnd.uscourts.gov), or through a file hosting service. Telephone status hearing is set for 6/30/2021 at 3 p.m. The toll-free number for the next hearing is 877-336-1831, access code 5995354. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the prohibition against recording and rebroadcasting of court proceedings.Mailed notice (sxw, )
June 18, 2021 Filing 38 Letter to the Honorable Judge Finnegan by Daniel E Davis Re: Response to the Court's May 21, 2021 Requests Regarding the Affidavit of Adam June and Confirmation of Data (DePodesta, Nancy)
June 17, 2021 Filing 37 AFFIDAVIT of Adam June, JD, LLM regarding order on motion to compel,, motion hearing, #34 , text entry, #35 (DePodesta, Nancy)
June 14, 2021 Filing 36 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Teleconference Status hearing is reset for 7/21/2021 at 9:15 AM. Prior to the conference call, you are directed to click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
June 2, 2021 Filing 35 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: The Respondent's unopposed request (submitted to the Courtroom Deputy by email on 6/1/2021) for a two week extension to provide the supplemental information described during the 5/21/2021 hearing is granted. By 6/18/2021, Respondent is to provide the supplemental information described during the 5/21/2021 hearing. Mailed notice (sxw)
May 21, 2021 Filing 34 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Motion hearing (by telephone) held as to Motion of the United States to Compel Native Quickbooks Reports #25 . The motion is taken under advisement. By 6/4/2021, Respondent is to provide the supplemental information described during the hearing. Mailed notice (sxw, )
May 13, 2021 Filing 33 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: Telephone hearing as to Motion of The United States to Compel Native Quickbooks Reports #25 is set on 5/21/2021 at 3:00 p.m. The toll-free number for the hearing is 877-336-1831, access code 5995354. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the prohibition against recording and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of the prohibition may result in sanctions.Mailed notice (sxw, )
May 11, 2021 Filing 32 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Teleconference Status hearing held on 5/11/2021 and continued for 6/15/2021 at 9:00 AM. Prior to the conference call, you are directed to click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
April 13, 2021 Filing 31 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. On the Court's own Motion, Teleconference Status hearing is reset for 5/11/2021 at 9:00 AM. Prior to the conference call, you are directed to click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
March 29, 2021 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. On the Court's own Motion, Teleconference Status hearing is reset for 4/14/2021 at 9:15 AM. Mailed notice (lk, )
March 2, 2021 Filing 29 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. On the Court's own Motion, Teleconference Status hearing set for 3/4/2021 is reset for 3/30/2021 at 9:00 AM. Prior to the conference call, you are directed to click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 28 REPLY by Plaintiff United States of America in Support of Motion to Compel #25 (Terman, Sarah)
February 8, 2021 Filing 27 REPLY by Daniel E Davis to MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America to compel #25 , memorandum in support of motion #26 Response to Motion of the United States to Compel Native Quickbooks Reports (DePodesta, Nancy)
January 8, 2021 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM by United States of America in support of motion to compel #25 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A., #2 Exhibit B., #3 Exhibit C., #4 Exhibit D.)(Terman, Sarah)
January 8, 2021 Filing 25 MOTION by Plaintiff United States of America to compel (Terman, Sarah)
December 3, 2020 Filing 24 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan: The Court adopts the parties' agreed briefing schedule "on orally argued issues regarding attorney privilege work product review" #22 . Plaintiff's Motion to Compel is due by 1/8/2021 with Defendant's response by 2/8/2021, and Plaintiff's reply by 3/1/2021. Mailed notice (sxw, )
November 30, 2020 Filing 23 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan pursuant to Local Rule 72.1. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/30/20.(gcy, )
November 24, 2020 Filing 22 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Teleconference Status hearing held on 11/24/2020. Parties' orally argued issues regarding attorney privilege work product review. Issue is being referred to Magistrate Judge Finnegan. Status hearing set for 3/4/2021 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (lk, )
October 28, 2020 Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Teleconference Status hearing held on 10/27/2020. The Government reports that Parties have been working together to complete summons compliance, but they need a little more time. Teleconference Status hearing set for 11/24/2020 at 9:00 AM. Prior to the conference call, Please click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900 to take you to Judge Kendall's telephone conference login. From there, join conference As Guest, ENTER YOUR NAME, Type the digits in the picture, Click on the Call Me option and fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, we ask that you keep your phone on mute until your case is called. Please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH AND EVERY TIME BEFORE YOU SPEAK. The Court is also asking that speaker phone not be used. Please consider the sound quality when utilizing certain devices. If Parties have issues being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.Mailed notice (lk, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 20 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Teleconference Status hearing held on 10/2/2020. The Government advised they have received and reviewed documents and the interview of the taxpayer is scheduled. Teleconference Status hearing set for 10/27/2020 at 9:00 AM. Prior to the conference call, Please click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900 to take you to Judge Kendall's telephone conference login. From there, join conference As Guest, ENTER YOUR NAME, Type the digits in the picture, Click on the Call Me option and fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, we ask that you keep your phone on mute until your case is called. Please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH AND EVERY TIME BEFORE YOU SPEAK. If Parties have issues being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in. Mailed notice (lk, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Teleconference Status hearing held on 8/4/2020. Defense Counsel reported that Daniel Davis has produced documents to the Government. The Government advised they need more time to review documents. Teleconference Status hearing set for 10/2/2020 at 9:15 AM. Prior to the conference call, Please click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900 to take you to Judge Kendall's telephone conference login. From there, join conference As Guest, ENTER YOUR NAME, Type the digits in the picture, Click on the Call Me option and fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, we ask that you keep your phone on mute until your case is called. Please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH AND EVERY TIME BEFORE YOU SPEAK. The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing.Mailed notice (lk, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. On the Court's own Motion, Status hearing set for 8/4/2020 at 9:00 AM is reset for 10:30 AM and will proceed via Teleconference. Prior to the conference call, Please click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900 to take you to Judge Kendall's telephone conference login. From there, join conference As Guest, ENTER YOUR NAME, Type the digits in the picture, Click on the Call Me option and fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, we ask that you keep your phone on mute until your case is called. Please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH AND EVERY TIME BEFORE YOU SPEAK. Mailed notice (lk, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk8, Docket)
May 28, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. By agreement of the parties, Status hearing set for June 29, 2020 is reset for August 3, 2020 at 9:00 am. Please refer to Minute Entry #7 regarding appearing telephonically. Mailed notice (lk, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
May 18, 2020 Filing 14 Joint Status Report by United States of America (Terman, Sarah)
May 11, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. On the Court's own Motion due to Third Amended General Order 20-0012, Rule to Show Cause regarding Daniel E. Davis set for 5/14/2020 is rescheduled for 6/29/2020 at 9:00 AM. Joint Status Report due by 5/18/2020 as directed in Third Amended General Order 20-0012. Mailed notice (lk, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket8, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. On the Court's own Motion due to Second Amended General Order 20-0012, Rule to Show Cause regarding Daniel E. Davis set for 4/21/2020 is rescheduled for 5/14/2020 at 9:00 AM.Mailed notice (lk, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket4, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. By request and agreement of parties due to General Order #7 , Rule to Show Cause regarding Daniel E. Davis set for 3/17/2020 is rescheduled for 4/21/2020 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (lk, )
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 GENERAL ORDER signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall: In view of the current situation regarding COVID19, the Court encourages counsel with motion or status hearings set over the next few weeks to (a) file a joint status report if they believe that the motion and/or status can be handled without an appearance simply by providing the Court with an update on the progress of the case or an indication that the relief requested in the motion either is unopposed or can be addressed with an agreed briefing schedule or (b) make arrangements to appear by telephone for all motions and status hearings that cannot be handled without an appearance. If you would like to appear by telephone for any hearing or status conference, please contact the Courtroom Deputy, Lynn Kandziora, preferably by email (Lynn_Kandziora@ilnd.uscourts.gov) or by telephone (312) 4085153, if necessary, to advise her of the case number and the name of the person who is expecting to participate. We will open the phone lines shortly before the start time every day that court is in session. Please use the Court's toll free call in number 877 848 7030, conference access code is 2413900. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, we ask that you keep your phone on mute until your case is called. Signed by the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 3/13/2020: Mailed notice. (rp, )
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Daniel E Davis by Nancy L. DePodesta (DePodesta, Nancy)
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Rule to Show Cause entered as to Daniel E. Davis as to why he should not comply in full with requirements of summons. Rule to Show Cause hearing set for 3/17/2020 at 9:00 AM. Defendant Davis is ordered to attend Rule to Show Cause hearing on 3/17/2020. Mailed notice (lk, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (jh, )
February 12, 2020 Filing 3 PETITION to enforce IRS summons filed by UNITED STATES (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Declaration, #2 Exhibit B. Summons, #3 Exhibit C. Last Chance Letter)(Terman, Sarah)
February 12, 2020 Filing 2 DESIGNATION of Sarah Fattahi Terman as U.S. Attorney for Plaintiff UNITED STATES (Terman, Sarah)
February 12, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Terman, Sarah)
February 12, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES
Represented By: Sarah Fattahi Terman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Sarah Fattahi Terman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel E Davis
Represented By: Nancy L. DePodesta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?