Center for Biological Diversity, Inc. et al v. Bernhardt et al
Plaintiff: The Hoosier Environmental Council, Inc., Center for Biological Diversity, Inc., Prairie Rivers Network and Fishable Indiana Streams for Hoosiers, Inc.
Defendant: Secretary David Bernhardt, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, Asst. Director Gary Frazer, David Bernhardt and Gary Frazer
Case Number: 1:2020cv01227
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Jorge L Alonso
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket12, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Inc., Fishable Indiana Streams for Hoosiers, Inc., Prairie Rivers Network, The Hoosier Environmental Council, Inc. by John Buse (Buse, John)
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants David Bernhardt, Gary Frazer, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service by Davis Aaron Backer (Backer, Davis)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso: :Initial status hearing set for 4/22/20 at 9:30 a.m. Parties shall review and comply with Judge Alonso's Standing Order on The Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project on his website. Plaintiff's motion to appear pro hac vice #6 is granted. Attorney John Buse is given leave to file an appearance on behalf of Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity, Inc. Notice mailed by judge's staff (lf, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Nigel B Cooney as U.S. Attorney for Defendants David Bernhardt, Gary Frazer, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service (Cooney, Nigel)
February 25, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16763185. (Buse, John)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (nsf, )
February 21, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to David Bernhardt, Gary Frazer, U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General (dxb, )
February 20, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Jorge L. Alonso. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Inc., Fishable Indiana Streams for Hoosiers, Inc., Prairie Rivers Network, The Hoosier Environmental Council, Inc. by Robert Adam Weinstock (Weinstock, Robert)
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Center for Biological Diversity, Inc., Fishable Indiana Streams for Hoosiers, Inc., Prairie Rivers Network, The Hoosier Environmental Council, Inc. by Mark Norman Templeton (Templeton, Mark)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Templeton, Mark)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Prairie Rivers Network, Center for Biological Diversity, Inc., The Hoosier Environmental Council, Inc., Fishable Indiana Streams for Hoosiers, Inc.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16744458. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lake sturgeon listing petition, #2 Exhibit 60-day notice of intent to sue, #3 Exhibit Return receipt for 60-day notice)(Templeton, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity, Inc. et al v. Bernhardt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Hoosier Environmental Council, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Norman Templeton
Represented By: Robert Adam Weinstock
Represented By: John Buse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Norman Templeton
Represented By: Robert Adam Weinstock
Represented By: John Buse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prairie Rivers Network
Represented By: Mark Norman Templeton
Represented By: Robert Adam Weinstock
Represented By: John Buse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fishable Indiana Streams for Hoosiers, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Norman Templeton
Represented By: Robert Adam Weinstock
Represented By: John Buse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary David Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Davis Aaron Backer
Represented By: Nigel B Cooney
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asst. Director Gary Frazer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Represented By: Davis Aaron Backer
Represented By: Nigel B Cooney
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Frazer
Represented By: Davis Aaron Backer
Represented By: Nigel B Cooney
Represented By: AUSA - Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?