Caporale v. Smith & Nephew, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gabriel J. Caporale
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc. and Neubauer Perkins, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01263
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket5, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 14 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Motion hearing held. The Court sets the following briefing schedule on Plaintiff's emergency motion to remand #8 : Defendant Smith & Nephew, Inc. shall respond by 5:00 p.m. on 3/19/2020 and Plaintiff shall reply thereto by 3/27/2020. The Defendant's obligation to answer and the parties' MIDP are stayed until further order of the Court. Status hearing set for 4/29/2020 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice (ef, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Wayne M. Goldstein, M.D. regarding motion to remand #8 (Cesarone, Frank)
February 24, 2020 Filing 12 Amended NOTICE of Motion by Frank Vincent Cesarone for presentment of motion to remand #8 before Honorable Andrea R. Wood on 2/25/2020 at 10:00 AM. (Cesarone, Frank)
February 24, 2020 Filing 11 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood for all further proceedings. Honorable Gary Feinerman no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 2/24/2020.(pk, )
February 24, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The status hearing set for 3/17/2020 #7 and the motion hearing set for 2/25/2020 #9 are stricken. Due to the recusal of Judge Feinerman, this case will be reassigned to another Judge. The parties shall contact that Judge for further proceedings.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Motion by Frank Vincent Cesarone for presentment of motion to remand #8 before Honorable Gary Feinerman on 2/25/2020 at 09:00 AM. (Cesarone, Frank)
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION by Plaintiff Gabriel J. Caporale to remand (Cesarone, Frank)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman: Status hearing set for 3/17/2020 at 9:00 a.m.Mailed notice. (jlj, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Gabriel J. Caporale by Frank Vincent Cesarone (Cesarone, Frank)
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (pk, )
February 21, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Gary Feinerman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Smith & Nephew, Inc. by Daniel Adam Spira (Spira, Daniel)
February 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Spira, Daniel)
February 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2020-L-000754) filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16748403. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Spira, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caporale v. Smith & Nephew, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Adam Spira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neubauer Perkins, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriel J. Caporale
Represented By: Frank Vincent Cesarone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?