King v. Hei Hotel Chicago Downtown Autograph Collections
Plaintiff: Utica King
Defendant: Hei Hotel Chicago Downtown Autograph Collections
Case Number: 1:2020cv01283
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Matthew F Kennelly
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Correction regarding docket entry #15 (pk, )
April 20, 2020 SUMMONS Issued along with USM 285 form(s), certified copy of order dated 4/17/20 to the U.S. Marshal's Office for service as to Defendant Hei Hotel Chicago Downtown Autograph Collections (pk, )
April 17, 2020 Filing 15 Entered in error Modified on 4/20/2020 (pk, ).
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is granted #4 . Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel is denied #5 , as plaintiff has failed to describe a sufficient effort to retain counsel on her his own. The Marshal is appointed to serve the defendant with summons and the complaint. Plaintiff is directed to cooperate with the Marshal as requested in effectuating service of process and, specifically, is directed to complete and return any forms sent by the Clerk or Marshal (including a USM-285 form) to assist the Marshal in serving process on the defendant. The case is set for a status hearing on June 22, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. in Judge Kennelly's courtroom (Room 2103). If plaintiff fails to appear at that time, the case may be dismissed for want of prosecution. Signed by the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly on 4/17/2020. Mailed notice(pk, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket4, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 12, 2020 Filing 11 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Utica King (las, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED complaint by Utica King against Hei Hotel Chicago Downtown Autograph Collections. (Exhibits) (pk, )
February 27, 2020 Filing 9 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Utica King (pk, )
February 27, 2020 Filing 8 RECEIVED Amended Complaint and by Utica King. (Exhibits) (pk, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION by Plaintiff Utica King for attorney representation (ec, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION by Plaintiff Utica King for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ec, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE Appearance by Plaintiff Utica King (ec, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (ec, )
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 RECEIVED Complaint and one copies by Utica King. (Exhibits) (ec, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: King v. Hei Hotel Chicago Downtown Autograph Collections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utica King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hei Hotel Chicago Downtown Autograph Collections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?