Pierce v. Great Lakes Dredge & Dock Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Kenny Pierce
Defendant: Great Lakes Dredge & Dock Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01353
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Ronald A Guzman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Great Lakes Dredge & Dock Company, LLC by John Andrew O'Donnell, Jr (O'Donnell, John)
April 8, 2020 Filing 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Great Lakes Dredge & Dock Company, LLC by Patrick Joseph Cullinan (Cullinan, Patrick)
April 8, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Great Lakes Dredge & Dock Company, LLC by Steven Brian Belgrade (Belgrade, Steven)
April 8, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Great Lakes Dredge & Dock Company, LLC by John Andrew O'Donnell (O'Donnell, John)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: In light of the Second Amended General Order 20-0012 issued on 3/30/2020, the initial status hearing set for 4/22/2020 at 10:30 a.m. is stricken and will be reset at a later date. Mailed notice (is, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket3, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (ecw, )
March 4, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Great Lakes Dredge & Dock Company, LLC. (acm, )
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Court orders the parties to appear for an initial status hearing. All parties shall refer to and comply with Judge Guzman's requirements for the initial appearance as outlined in Judge Guzman's case management procedures, which can be found at: www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Initial status hearing set for 4/22/2020 at 10:30 AM. Mailed notice (is, )
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Kenny Pierce by Laurence M. Landsman (Landsman, Laurence)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Landsman, Laurence)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Kenny Pierce; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16761414.(Landsman, Laurence)
February 25, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pierce v. Great Lakes Dredge & Dock Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenny Pierce
Represented By: Laurence M. Landsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Dredge & Dock Company, LLC
Represented By: John Andrew O'Donnell
Represented By: Steven Brian Belgrade
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Cullinan
Represented By: John Andrew O'Donnell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?