Principe v. Vill. of Melrose Park et al
Plaintiff: James Principe
Defendant: Ronald Serpico, Village of Melrose Park and Christine Piemonte
Case Number: 1:2020cv01545
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Marvin E Aspen
Referring Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1985
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE by James Principein Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Christine Piemonte, Ronald Serpico, Village of Melrose Park #17 (Scatchell, Gianna)
May 28, 2020 Filing 19 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The briefing schedule on defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #17 is as follows: plaintiff's response is due 6/19/20; defendants' reply 7/6/20. Discovery is stayed. The court will rule on the motion by cm/ecf and direct the parties to confer on a proposed scheduling order after the ruling. Notices mailed. (psm, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 18 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Manish S. Shah for all further proceedings. Honorable Marvin E. Aspen no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/27/2020. (lma, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Christine Piemonte, Ronald Serpico, Village of Melrose Park (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Zimmer, K.)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 15 Partial ANSWER to Complaint by Ronald Serpico (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Zimmer, K.)
May 26, 2020 Filing 14 Partial ANSWER to Complaint by Village of Melrose Park (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Zimmer, K.)
April 28, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: The status hearing set for 5/21/2020 is stricken and reset to 7/9/2020 at 10:30 a.m. The Third Amended General Order 20-0012 In Re: COVID-19 Public Emergency will not impact previously set deadlines in this case absent any motions showing cause for an extension. Mailed notice (ags)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 11 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Christine Piemonte, Ronald Serpico, Village of Melrose Park by Joseph Anthony Giambrone (Giambrone, Joseph)
April 1, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Christine Piemonte. Christine Piemonte waiver sent on 3/24/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Zimmer, K.)
April 1, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Ronald Serpico. Ronald Serpico waiver sent on 3/24/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Zimmer, K.)
April 1, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Village of Melrose Park. Village of Melrose Park waiver sent on 3/24/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Zimmer, K.)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Christine Piemonte, Ronald Serpico, Village of Melrose Park by K. Austin Zimmer (Zimmer, K.)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket13, )
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (tg, )
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Initial status hearing is set for 5/21/2020 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags)
March 3, 2020 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Christine Piemonte, Ronald Serpico, Village of Melrose Park (rc, )
March 3, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. Case assignment: Random assignment. (acm, )
March 3, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff James Principe by Gianna Rochelle Scatchell (Scatchell, Gianna)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Scatchell, Gianna)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by James Principe; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16786673.(Scatchell, Gianna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Principe v. Vill. of Melrose Park et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Serpico
Represented By: K. Austin Zimmer
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Giambrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Melrose Park
Represented By: K. Austin Zimmer
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Giambrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Piemonte
Represented By: K. Austin Zimmer
Represented By: Joseph Anthony Giambrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Principe
Represented By: Gianna Rochelle Scatchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?