Society Insurance Company v. Viking Corporation, The et al
Plaintiff: Society Insurance Company a/s/o Louie's Boston Fish Market, LLC and Society Insurance Company
Defendant: Kotur Mechanical, The Viking Corporation, Lotur Mechanical Group, LLC and Viking Corporation, The
Case Number: 1:2020cv01599
Filed: March 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Andrea R Wood
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 10, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Viking Corporation, The(Ruehlmann, Gregory)
April 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Viking Corporation, The (Ruehlmann, Gregory)
April 3, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Attorney applications to appear pro hac vice #11 and #12 are granted. Mailed notice. (dal, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16907448. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Court Admissions)(Clare, Susan)
April 1, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0752-16904338. (Drake, Geoffrey)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket12, )
March 17, 2020 Filing 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Viking Corporation, The by Julia Ruth Zousmer (Zousmer, Julia)
March 17, 2020 Filing 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Viking Corporation, The by Gregory Arthur Ruehlmann, Jr (Ruehlmann, Gregory)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (tg, )
March 12, 2020 Filing 6 Waiver of Service for Viking Corporation by Society Insurance Company (McLean, Matthew)
March 9, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Initial status hearing set for 5/5/2020 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (ef, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Society Insurance Company by Matthew S. McLean (McLean, Matthew)
March 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (pk, )
March 5, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kl, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (McLean, Matthew)
March 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Society Insurance Company a/s/o Louie's Boston Fish Market, LLC; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16797703.(McLean, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Society Insurance Company v. Viking Corporation, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kotur Mechanical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Viking Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lotur Mechanical Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Corporation, The
Represented By: Gregory Arthur Ruehlmann, Jr.
Represented By: Julia Ruth Zousmer
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Drake
Represented By: Susan Marie Clare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Society Insurance Company a/s/o Louie's Boston Fish Market, LLC
Represented By: Matthew S. McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Society Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew S. McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?