Aida, et al v. Boeing Company, The
Plaintiff: AIDA et. al., Enrico Gerri Tua, Aida, Aldi Radyanto, Rachma Putri Nariswari, Sutarno, Bambang Supriyadi, Mochamad Fajar Ardiyono Putra, Tju Lian Sin, Devina Oktavia Tjandayu, Santun, Bambang Subagyo, Surtiyem, Puji Lestari, Yulmahdi, Stevando Magara Haposan Sihombing, Slamet, Kartini, Otong Edi Budaya, Dhani Dwi Raharjo, Budi Setiawan, Sutarni, Nurmala Ramelan, Debora Christy Tjandayu, Wiwik Dwi Handayani, Mardiyem Nur Rahman, Thong Kon Ngo, Yenti Sulastri, Sumsima, Sulastri, Sariyoso, Angga Bramantya Wirabuana Putra, Tjhin Nyuk Hen, Susiyani Budhihardjo, Indah Juliana Purwaningtyas, Debby Cassandra, Siharman, Syamsir Samsudin, Rasmi Sora, Tjhin Ai Nit and Dermawan Riama Siregar
Defendant: THE BOEING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation and Boeing Company, The
Case Number: 1:2020cv01775
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Illinois
Presiding Judge: Thomas M Durkin
Referring Judge: Manish S Shah
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 30 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal, this case is dismissed, with prejudice and without costs to any party. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk8, Docket)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, )
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: All claims of Plaintiffs: SYAMSIR SAMSUDIN, as Personal Representative of the Estate of VICKY ARDIAN, and individually; DEBBY CASSANDRA, individually, and as next friend of her minor children, A.A., R.A.A., and M.Z.A.; and, RASMI SORA,IN RE: LION AIR FLIGHT JT 610 CRASHSYAMSIR SAMSUDIN, as Personal Representative of the Estate of VICKY ARDIAN, and individually; DEBBY CASSANDRA, individually, and as nextfriend of her minor children, A.A., R.A.A., and M.Z.A.; and, RASMI SORA, individually; in Consolidated Case No. 1:18-cv-07686, which was originally filed under cause number 20-cv-01775; are hereby dismissed in their entirety with prejudice and without costs. This fully resolves these Plaintiffs' claims. All of these Plaintiffs' claims are hereby dismissed in their entirety with prejudice and without costs. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/14/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, )
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims With PRejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Sutarni and Sutarno (as Personal Representative) terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/22/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims With Prejuice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Yenti Sulastri terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/22/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlement. Tjhin Nyuk Hen (as Personal Representative) terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/10/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Aldi Radyanto (as Personal Representative) terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/10/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudixe and Approval of Minor Settlements. Stevando Magara Haposan Sihombing terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/10/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Susiyani Budhihardjo (as Personal Representative) terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/10/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice., Budi Setiawan (as Personal Representative) terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/9/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice. Slamet, Wiwik Dwi Handayani (as Personal Representative) and Kartini terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/3/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Approving Joint Motion of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice. Devina Oktavia Tjandayu, Nurmala Ramelan (as Personal Representative) and Debora Christy Tjandayu terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/3/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 3, 2020 Filing 16 Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice. Sulastri, Dhani Dwi Raharjo (as Personal Representative) and Santun terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/3/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice. Mardiyem Nur Rahman (as Personal Representative) terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/3/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice. Aida (as Personal Representative) and Yulmahdi terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/3/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice. Surtiyem (as Personal Representative) terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/3/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice. Otong Edi Budaya (as Personal Representative) terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/2/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice. Angga Bramantya Wirabuana Putra (as Personal Representative) terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/2/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice. Sariyoso (as Personal Representative) terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/2/2020:Mailed notice(srn, )
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket8, )
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin for all further proceedings, pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Honorable Manish S. Shah no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/30/2020. (pj, )
March 17, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Enrico Gerri Tua, Stevando Magara Haposan Sihombing, Syamsir Samsudin, Sutarno, Siharman, Budi Setiawan, Yulmahdi, Aida, Aldi Radyanto, Yenti Sulastri, Slamet, Bambang Subagyo, Tjhin Nyuk Hen, Thong Kon Ngo, Rachma Putri Nariswari, Debby Cassandra, Susiyani Budhihardjo, Sumsima, Puji Lestari, Tju Lian Sin, Wiwik Dwi Handayani, Angga Bramantya Wirabuana Putra, Mochamad Fajar Ardiyono Putra, Tjhin Ai Nit, Devina Oktavia Tjandayu, Dermawan Riama Siregar, Sariyoso, Santun, Indah Juliana Purwaningtyas, Bambang Supriyadi, Otong Edi Budaya, Kartini, Mardiyem Nur Rahman, Dhani Dwi Raharjo, Surtiyem, Debora Christy Tjandayu, Sutarni, Rasmi Sora, Sulastri, Nurmala Ramelan as to The Boeing Company on 3/13/2020, answer due 5/12/2020. (Cao, Xiaoyin) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 3/23/2020) (pj, ).
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (tg, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lma, )
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff AIDA et. al. by Xiaoyin Cao (Cao, Xiaoyin)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff AIDA et. al. by Carmen David Caruso (Caruso, Carmen)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Caruso, Carmen)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by AIDA et. al.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16828216.(Caruso, Carmen)
March 13, 2020 CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Illinois Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aida, et al v. Boeing Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIDA et. al.
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrico Gerri Tua
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aida
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aldi Radyanto
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachma Putri Nariswari
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sutarno
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bambang Supriyadi
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mochamad Fajar Ardiyono Putra
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tju Lian Sin
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devina Oktavia Tjandayu
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santun
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bambang Subagyo
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Surtiyem
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puji Lestari
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yulmahdi
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stevando Magara Haposan Sihombing
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Slamet
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kartini
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otong Edi Budaya
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dhani Dwi Raharjo
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Budi Setiawan
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sutarni
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nurmala Ramelan
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debora Christy Tjandayu
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wiwik Dwi Handayani
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mardiyem Nur Rahman
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thong Kon Ngo
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yenti Sulastri
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sumsima
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sulastri
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sariyoso
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angga Bramantya Wirabuana Putra
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tjhin Nyuk Hen
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susiyani Budhihardjo
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indah Juliana Purwaningtyas
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debby Cassandra
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Siharman
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Syamsir Samsudin
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rasmi Sora
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tjhin Ai Nit
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dermawan Riama Siregar
Represented By: Xiaoyin Cao
Represented By: Carmen David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE BOEING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?